|
04.12.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2018 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
18.09.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.2018 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2018 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.05.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2018 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2016 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2015 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Decision to refuse according to the state of the file |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.10.2014 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2014 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.08.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.01.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.11.2010 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.10.2010 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |