EP2247005 - Optical receiving apparatus and optical communication system comprising it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2010/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akiyama, Yuichi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Hoshida, Takeshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Miura, Akira c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Kai, Yutaka c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Ooi, Hiroki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 06 /
Rasmussen, Jens C. c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 07 /
Nakamura, Kentaro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 08 /
Kuwata, Naoki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 09 /
Nishizawa, Yoshinori c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 10 /
Takahara, Tomoo c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 11 /
Yuki, Masahiro c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10153294.3 | 29.12.2005 | [2010/44] | Priority number, date | JP20050150219 | 23.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005150219 | JP20050192971 | 30.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005192971 | JP20050293039 | 05.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005293039 | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2247005 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2247005 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/50, H04B10/516, H04B10/556, H04B10/66, H04B10/67, G02F1/01, G02F1/225 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
G02F1/2255 (EP,US);
G02F1/0123 (EP,US);
H04B10/505 (EP,US);
H04B10/5051 (EP,US);
H04B10/5053 (EP,US);
H04B10/50575 (EP,US);
H04B10/50577 (EP,US);
H04B10/50595 (EP,US);
H04B10/5162 (EP,US);
H04B10/5165 (EP,US);
H04B10/5561 (EP,US);
H04B10/66 (EP,US);
H04B10/677 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/44] | H04B10/158 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/44] | Title | German: | Optische Empfangsvorrichtung und zugehöriges optisches Kommunikationssystem | [2016/11] | English: | Optical receiving apparatus and optical communication system comprising it | [2010/44] | French: | Appareil de réception optique et système de communication optique le comprenant | [2010/44] |
Former [2010/44] | Optische Empfangsvorrichtung und optisches Kommunikationssystem damit | Examination procedure | 23.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 08.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 07.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/02] | 23.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/02] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05028634.3 / EP1727303 | EP07009948.6 / EP1816763 | EP09168464.7 / EP2114025 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050028634) is 10.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1513273 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0025] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0042] * * figures 3,5A,5B,5C,5D *; | [A]US6396605 (HEFLINGER DONALD G [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 14-23 * * column 3, lines 57-64 * * column 4, lines 8-32 * * column 4, lines 57-64 * * column 5, lines 2-6 * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 62 *; | [A]WO03049333 (BOOKHAM TECHNOLOGY PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 * | [A] - SWANSON E A LIVAS J C ET AL, "HIGH SENSITIVITY OPTICALLY PREAMPLIFIED DIRECT DETECTION DPSK RECEIVER WITH ACTIVE DELAY-LINE STABILIZATION", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19940201), vol. 6, no. 2, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 263 - 265, XP000439768 [A] 1-5 * figure 1 * * page 264, column L, paragraph 3 - page 264, column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.275445 |