EP2248755 - Arm made of composite material and respective production method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cifa S.P.A. Via Stati Uniti d'America 26 20030 Senago, Milano / IT | [2010/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cortellini, Mauro Marco / Via Milano, 32 20089, Rozzano (MI) / IT | 02 /
Maini, Paolo Dario / Via Carlo Antonietti, 14 20052, Monza / IT | 03 /
Bernasconi, Andrea / Via Poggi, 14 20131, Milano / IT | 04 /
Beretta, Stefano / Via Stromboli, 17 27058, Voghera (PV) / IT | [2012/20] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
Cortellini, Mauro Marco Via Milano, 32 20089, Rozzano (MI) / IT | ||
02 /
Maini, Paolo Dario Via Carlo Antonietti, 14 20052, Monza / IT | |||
03 /
Bernasconi, Andrea Via Poggi, 14 20131, Milano / IT | |||
04 /
Beretta, Stefano Via Stromboli, 17 27058, Voghera (PV) / IT | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 10157093.5 | 19.03.2010 | [2010/45] | Priority number, date | IT2009UD00090 | 06.05.2009 Original published format: IT UD20090090 | [2010/45] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2248755 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2248755 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/70, E04G21/04 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
B66C23/70 (EP,US);
E04G21/04 (EP,US);
E04G21/0436 (EP);
Y10T137/8807 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/45] | Title | German: | Arm aus Verbundwerkstoff und jeweiligen Herstellungsverfahren | [2010/45] | English: | Arm made of composite material and respective production method | [2010/45] | French: | Bras en matériau composite et procédé pour sa production | [2010/45] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 18.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | HR | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | MK | 16.05.2012 | MT | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | SM | 16.05.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2015/24] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
SM | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
MT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
HR | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP2039498 (CIFA SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-6 * paragraphs [0006] , [0012] , [0013] , [0017] , [0018] , [0024] , [0025]; figure 5 *; | [A]US3947191 (MILNER JR EDWIN EARL) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 15; figures 6,11 *; | [A]US3087581 (PITMAN RAYMOND F) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 69 - column 4, line 8; figure 3 *; | [A]JP2002046993 (AICHI CORP KK) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0816462 | EP0815267 |