EP2241904 - Device for locating a mobile object and method for operating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Libify Technologies GmbH Rüdesheimer Str. 11 80686 München / DE | [2014/16] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states GEODOG GmbH Rüdesheimer Str. 11 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states GEODOG GmbH Dachauer Str. 192 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/42] | For all designated states econes Gmbh Dachauerstrasse 192 80992 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hölscher, Julian Anna-Dandler-Strasse 10 81247 München / DE | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstraße 4 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/42] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10158055.3 | 26.03.2010 | [2010/42] | Priority number, date | DE20091015544 | 30.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009015544 | [2010/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2241904 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2241904 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/34, G01S1/00 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
G01S19/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Orten eines beweglichen Objektes und Verfahren zum Betrieb der Vorrichtung | [2010/42] | English: | Device for locating a mobile object and method for operating same | [2010/42] | French: | Dispositif de localisation d'un objet mobile et procédé de fonctionnement du dispositif | [2010/42] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2010 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | ES | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | HR | 14.05.2014 | IT | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MK | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | PL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | SM | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | NO | 14.08.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 26.03.2010 | |
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
TR | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5448773 (MCBURNEY PAUL W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,11,15 * column 4, line 19 - column 9, line 25; figures 1,3a,3b,4,5,6,7 * [Y] 3,6-10,12-14; | [Y]US6172640 (DURST JENNIFER [US], et al) [Y] 3,6-10,12-14 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 1; figures 2,3a,6 * * column 7, line 59 - column 9, line 34 * * column 11, line 30 - column 12, line 13; claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO2007076539 (CENTRALITY COMMUNICATIONS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * page 7, line 4 - page 10, line 16; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2003122708 (PERCY ROGER D [US], et al) [A] 3,7,9 * paragraphs [0080] - [0084]; figures 6,8,10 * | by applicant | WO2006092466 | US2008150797 | US2005033515 | US6972684 |