EP2329791 - Application device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Frank Gatterweg 46 6800 Feldkirch / AT | 02 /
Gatehr, Klaus Eichengasse 12 6824 Schlins / AT | 03 /
Holaschke, Sebastian Angelika-Kaufmann Strasse 6900 Bregenz / AT | 04 /
Suffel, Ralf Austrasse 3 9469 Haag / CH | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Splanemann Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10159504.9 | 09.04.2010 | [2011/23] | Priority number, date | EP20090178109 | 04.12.2009 Original published format: EP 09178109 | [2011/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2329791 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2329791 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/06 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
A61C5/62 (EP,US);
A61M5/31511 (US);
A61M2005/3103 (US);
A61M2005/3123 (US);
A61M5/31513 (US);
A61M5/31515 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Applikationsvorrichtung | [2011/23] | English: | Application device | [2011/23] | French: | Dispositif d'application | [2011/23] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2010 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 05.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/01] | 31.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE4332308 (HERAEUS KULZER GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-12 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 17 ** figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5411488 (PAGAY SHRIKANT N [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 1, lines 24-25 * * column 3, lines 10-19 * * column 5, line 16 - column 7, line 47 * * figures 1-9 *; | [XI]US2003035744 (HORITA TAIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,10,11 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] - [0 28] , [0 45] , [0 53] , [0 58] - [0068] * * figures 1, 2, 4, 5A-5D * [I] 2,4,6,8,9; | [XI]US2005182371 (WAGNER GARY S [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,7,10,11 * paragraph [0034] * * figures 4A, 4B * [I] 4,5,8,9,12; | [X]JP2006158983 (NIPRO CORP, et al) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4332308 |