EP2298303 - Pharmaceutical combinations of hydrocodone and naltrexone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. 1, rue Jean Piret 2350 Luxembourg / LU | [2016/26] |
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. 2, avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshlack, Benjamin 350 South Ocean Boulevard Apt. 3D Boca Raton, FL 33432 / US | 02 /
Wright, Curtis 21 Summit Avenue Rockport, MA 01966 / US | 03 /
Breder, Chris 5 Annjim Drive Greenwich, CT 06830 / US | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | Bühler, Dirk Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/12] | Bühler, Dirk Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10159824.1 | 09.09.2004 | [2011/12] | Priority number, date | US20030506222P | 25.09.2003 Original published format: US 506222 P | [2011/12] | Previously filed application, date | WO2004US29521 | 09.09.2004 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2298303 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/485, A61K9/00, A61K9/22, A61P25/36 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/485 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/485, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/12] | Extension states | AL | 13.04.2010 | HR | 13.04.2010 | LT | 13.04.2010 | LV | 13.04.2010 | MK | 13.04.2010 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE KOMBINATIONEN VON HYDROCODON UND NALTREXON | [2011/12] | English: | Pharmaceutical combinations of hydrocodone and naltrexone | [2011/12] | French: | COMBINAISONS PHARMACEUTIQUES D'HYDROCODONE ET DE NALTREXONE | [2011/12] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.02.2018 | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/38] | 11.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04788669.2 / EP1663229 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040788669) is 22.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9932119 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-26 * page 45, line 28 - line 31 *; | [X]WO0158451 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-26 * example 19 * * examples 4,5,9,10 * * page 26, line 32 - line 36 *; | [X]WO03013525 (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-26* claims 1,26,27 * | by applicant | US3133132 | US3173876 | US3276586 | US3541005 | US3541006 | US3546876 | US3845770 | US3916889 | US3916899 | US4063064 | US4088864 | US4160020 | US4200098 | US4285987 | US4769372 | US4785000 | US4861598 | US4957681 | US5130311 | US5215758 | US5273760 | US5286493 | US5321012 | US5324351 | US5356467 | US5409944 | US5436265 | US5472943 | US5472712 | US5475995 | US5502058 | US5510368 | US5514680 | US5521213 | US5536752 | US5550142 | US5552422 | US5556838 | US5593994 | US5604260 | US5604253 | US5616601 | US5639780 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, (1980), pages 1553 - 1593 |