blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2251231 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2251231



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2769
02.10.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
21.09.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.09.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
20.09.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
15.09.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 25
15.09.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.09.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
12.07.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.07.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
12.07.2017 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
07.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
02.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
02.06.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
16.03.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
16.03.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
03.02.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
02.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.02.2017 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
02.02.2017 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
02.02.2017 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
01.02.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
01.02.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
27.01.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
26.01.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.11.2016 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
12.12.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
11.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.12.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
06.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.09.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
30.09.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 17
30.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
30.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 18
30.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
30.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.09.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
30.09.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.05.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
12.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 89
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 89
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 49
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 51
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 49
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 58
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 51
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 53
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 58
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 90
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 53
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 48
09.02.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 90
09.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
09.02.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 22
22.01.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
12.01.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
12.01.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 8
12.01.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
12.01.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
12.01.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 30
05.11.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
05.11.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
31.10.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
31.10.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
31.10.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
31.10.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
31.10.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.09.2014 Annex Opposition 2
24.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
19.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
15.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 2
15.09.2014 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 4
10.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
05.09.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.09.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
03.09.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
03.09.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 50
03.09.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
03.09.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
03.09.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
03.09.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.08.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
01.08.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
01.08.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
01.08.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
01.08.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
02.07.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.06.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
28.05.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
27.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 17
23.05.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 17
23.05.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
23.05.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
23.05.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.05.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
23.05.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
23.05.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
22.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 9
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 11
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 10
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 10
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 12
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 12
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 12
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 10
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 11
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 12
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 11
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 12
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 12
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 12
22.05.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 12
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 16
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 16
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 36
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 36
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 21
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 16
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 17
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 8
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 21
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 36
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 36
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 18
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 16
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 17
22.05.2014 Amended description with annotations Opposition 18
22.05.2014 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 6
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 4
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 6
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 6
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 6
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 6
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 3
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 5
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 4
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 4
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 6
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 6
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 6
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 6
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 6
22.05.2014 Claims Opposition 6
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 39
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 16
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 8
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 15
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 40
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 19
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 40
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 16
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 15
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 15
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 40
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 19
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 15
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 17
22.05.2014 Description Opposition 17
22.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
22.05.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 29
08.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2014 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
22.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
19.12.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
19.12.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
19.12.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
19.12.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.12.2013 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 4
19.12.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.12.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
20.07.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 31
18.07.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
18.07.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 31
28.03.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.03.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
21.02.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
21.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
21.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
21.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
21.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
21.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
21.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
21.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
21.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
21.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
21.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
21.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
21.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
26.04.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.03.2012 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
15.03.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.03.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
27.02.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.02.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
27.02.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.02.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 50
11.02.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
11.02.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
11.02.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 14
11.02.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 14
11.02.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 9
23.11.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.10.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.10.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
09.09.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
09.09.2010 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
09.09.2010 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
09.09.2010 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
31.08.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.08.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 4
31.08.2010 European search report Search / examination 2
18.06.2010 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
18.06.2010 Priority document Search / examination 59
09.06.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
09.06.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
21.05.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.05.2010 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
18.05.2010 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.05.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.04.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.04.2010 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
26.04.2010 Claims Search / examination 7
26.04.2010 Description Search / examination 40
26.04.2010 Drawings Search / examination 4
26.04.2010 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4