EP2261750 - Image forming apparatus and toner remaining amount determining method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 2-17-2, Higashigotanda Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 17-2, Higashigotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Yoshihiro Toshiba TEC Kabushiki Kaisha 17-2, Higashigotanda 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8664 / JP | [2010/50] | Representative(s) | Gendron, Vincent Christian, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Gendron, Vincent Christian, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10164065.4 | 27.05.2010 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | US20090183431P | 02.06.2009 Original published format: US 183431 P | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2261750 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08, G03G15/00 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
G03G15/553 (EP,US);
G03G15/0856 (EP,US);
G03G15/086 (EP,US);
G03G15/0863 (EP,US);
G03G15/0868 (EP,US);
G03G15/556 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung und Bestimmungsverfahren für die verbleibende Tonermenge | [2010/50] | English: | Image forming apparatus and toner remaining amount determining method | [2010/50] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images et procédé de détermination de la quantité restante de toner | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/50] | 15.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003123889 (ISOBE HIRONOBU [JP], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0151] - [0242]; figures 2-4 * * paragraphs [0266] - [0316] *; | [I]EP0789322 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [I] 1-4,7-9,11,13-16,19,20 * column 3, lines 39-42; figures 2-7 * * column 5, line 16 - column 10, line 37 *; | [XI]US2008112715 (SHIROKI TOSHIKI [JP], et al) [X] 13-16,20 * paragraph [0005]; figures 1-11 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0082] * [I] 1-4,7-11,18,19; | [I]US5512980 (YAMAGUCHI YOSHIO [JP], et al) [I] 13-15 * figures 10-12; claims 1,2 * |