EP2260945 - Shower head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bossini S.p.A. 19, Via G. Rossini 25065 Lumezzane S.S. (Brescia) / IT | [2010/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bossini, Leonardo / Via Patuzza, 13 I-25080, Molinetto di Mazzano, BRESCIA / IT | [2012/22] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Bossini, Leonardo Via Patuzza, 13 I-25080, Molinetto di Mazzano, BRESCIA / IT | Representative(s) | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | ||
Former [2010/50] | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | Application number, filing date | 10164491.2 | 31.05.2010 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | IT2009BS00097 | 05.06.2009 Original published format: IT BS20090097 | [2010/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2260945 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2260945 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/18 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
B05B1/185 (EP);
B05B7/0425 (EP);
B05B7/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | Brausekopf | [2010/50] | English: | Shower head | [2010/50] | French: | Pomme de douche | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 30.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.05.2010 | AL | 30.05.2012 | AT | 30.05.2012 | BE | 30.05.2012 | CY | 30.05.2012 | CZ | 30.05.2012 | DK | 30.05.2012 | EE | 30.05.2012 | FI | 30.05.2012 | HR | 30.05.2012 | IT | 30.05.2012 | LT | 30.05.2012 | LV | 30.05.2012 | MK | 30.05.2012 | MT | 30.05.2012 | NL | 30.05.2012 | PL | 30.05.2012 | RO | 30.05.2012 | SE | 30.05.2012 | SI | 30.05.2012 | SK | 30.05.2012 | SM | 30.05.2012 | TR | 30.05.2012 | IE | 31.05.2012 | LU | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | BG | 30.08.2012 | NO | 30.08.2012 | GR | 31.08.2012 | IS | 30.09.2012 | PT | 01.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AL | 30.05.2012 | |
AT | 30.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
SM | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 31.05.2012 | ||
LU | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 30.05.2012 | |
AT | 30.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 30.05.2012 | |
AT | 30.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
IE | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 30.05.2012 | |
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 30.05.2012 | |
NO | 30.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006163391 (SCHORN FRANZ [DE]) [X] 1-6,11,12 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0078]; figures 3,4,7-14 * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0064]; figures 1-2 * [Y] 7,8; | [XY]DE10313822 (HANSGROHE AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8; | [XY]DE102004056070 (HANSGROHE AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8; | [XPY]JP2009279484 (INAX CORP) [XP] 1-6,11,12 * abstract * [Y] 7,8; | [XY]US2002100818 (BLESSING GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,11,12 * paragraph [0024]; figure - * [Y] 7,8; | [Y]DE102006013881 (SCHNEIDER SIEGFRIED [DE]) [Y] 7,8 * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0008]; figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US2008011880 (BUTZKE KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0024]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2006151640 (MIURA SHOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0021] , [0083]; figure - * |