EP2397851 - Method for selecting mevalonate synthesis modulators using cells derived from pluripotent human cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre d'Etude des Cellules Souches 5, rue Henri Desbruères 91000 Evry / FR | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pinset, Christian 111 boulevard Magenta 75010, Paris / FR | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 10166631.1 | 21.06.2010 | [2011/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2397851 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2397851 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, C12N5/077, C12N5/0735 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
G01N33/5073 (EP,US);
G01N33/5014 (US);
C12N5/0662 (EP,US);
C12Q1/025 (US);
C12N2500/38 (EP,US);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2506/02 (EP,US);
C12N2506/45 (EP,US);
G01N2500/04 (US);
G01N2500/10 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | Auswahlmethode der Mevalonat-Synthesemodulatoren unter Einsatz von Derivatzellen pluripotenter menschlicher Zellen | [2011/51] | English: | Method for selecting mevalonate synthesis modulators using cells derived from pluripotent human cells | [2011/51] | French: | Méthode de sélection des modulateurs de la synthèse de mévalonate en utilisant des cellules dérivées de cellules pluripotentes humaines | [2011/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 19.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2010 | AL | 07.01.2015 | AT | 07.01.2015 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | ES | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | IT | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MK | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | NL | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | PT | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | SM | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | NO | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | IE | 21.06.2015 | LU | 21.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 21.06.2010 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MK | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PT | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 21.06.2015 | ||
LU | 21.06.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 21.06.2010 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MK | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 21.06.2015 | ||
LU | 21.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 21.06.2010 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 21.06.2015 | ||
LU | 21.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 21.06.2015 | ||
LU | 21.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
IE | 21.06.2015 | ||
LU | 21.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
LU | 21.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 07.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005111197 (WISCONSIN ALUMNI RES FOUND [US], et al) [I] 8-12 * column 64 - column 68 *; | [X]WO2008094597 (UNIV GEORGIA RES FOUND [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * page 33 - page 34; example 8; claims 12, 24 *; | [I]WO2008150498 (UNIV GEORGIA [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * figure 3b *; | [I]US2009081784 (VODYANYK MAKSYM A [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I] - KARLSSON C ET AL, "Human embryonic stem cell-derived mesenchymal progenitors-Potential in regenerative medicine", STEM CELL RESEARCH,, vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.SCR.2009.05.002, ISSN 1873-5061, (20090701), pages 39 - 50, (20090519), XP026285470 [I] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.scr.2009.05.002 | [I] - BOYD NOLAN L ET AL, "Human Embryonic Stem Cell-Derived Mesoderm-like Epithelium Transitions to Mesenchymal Progenitor Cells", TISSUE ENGINEERING PART A, (200908), vol. 15, no. 8, ISSN 1937-3341, pages 1897 - 1907, XP002609977 [I] 1-7 * page 1898; figures 3, 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/TEN.TEA.2008.0351 | [I] - KITAGAWA MICHINORI ET AL, "Differentiation of mesodermal cells from pluripotent stem cells", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY, (201004), vol. 91, no. 3, ISSN 0925-5710, pages 373 - 383, XP002609978 [I] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S12185-010-0518-8 | [T] - DE PEPPO GIUSEPPE MARIA ET AL, "Human Embryonic Mesodermal Progenitors Highly Resemble Human Mesenchymal Stem Cells and Display High Potential for Tissue Engineering Applications", TISSUE ENGINEERING PART A, (201007), vol. 16, no. 7, ISSN 1937-3341, pages 2161 - 2182, XP002609979 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/TEN-TEA.2009.0629 | Examination | WO2009100760 | - EUN J GANG ET AL, "SSEA-4 identifies mesenchymal stem cells from bone marrow", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, vol. 109, no. 4, doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2005-11-010504, ISSN 0006-4971, (20070215), pages 1743 - 1751, (20061024), XP008152783 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2005-11-010504 | by applicant | WO2004055174 |