EP2404872 - Fluorine container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.01.2012 [2012/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay SA Rue du Prince Albert, 33 1050 Brussels / BE | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riva, Marcello Zeppelinstrasse 7a 30175 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Mross, Stefan / Rue Seutin 43 1030 Brussels / BE | 03 /
Schwarze, Thomas Planetenstrasse 80 31278 Ahlten / DE | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Mross, Stefan P.M., et al SOLVAY S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Mross, Stefan P.M., et al SOLVAY S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 10168435.5 | 05.07.2010 | [2012/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2404872 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C01B7/20, F17C13/08 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
C01B7/20 (EP,KR,US);
B65D88/027 (US);
B65D25/14 (US);
B65D88/06 (US);
F17C13/08 (KR);
F17C13/083 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0107 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0111 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0134 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fluorbehälter | [2012/02] | English: | Fluorine container | [2012/02] | French: | Conteneur de fluorine | [2012/02] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2310713 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1-10,13 * page 4, line 11 - page 8, line 14; figure 2 * * page 1, line 23 - line 31 *; | [XI]US2003170402 (ARAI HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 16 * paragraph [0072]; claims 2-9 *[I] 1-5,10-15; | [XI]US2004016441 (SEKIYA AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 16 * figure 1; tables 1-22 * [I] 1-5,10-15; | [XI]US2010022095 (WU DINGJUN [US], et al) [X] 16 * claims 1,2,8 * [I] 1-5,10-15; | [XI]WO2010046428 (SOLVAY FLUOR GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-9,13,15 * page 2, line 25 - page 5, line 35; figures 1-5; claims 1,7,9 * [I] 10-12,14,16; | [X] - Code of Practice: Compressed Fluorine and Mixtures with Inert Gases, Singapore, Asia Industrial Gases Association, (20081110), XP002609132 [X] 1-5,13,15 * pages 9,10,18 - page 22 * |