EP2246360 - Compositions for the treatment of gastrointestinal disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Opposition rejected | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 301 Binney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts A 02142 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 301 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | ||
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Ironwood Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 320 Bent Street Cambridge, MA 02141 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Currie, Mark G. 18 Hall Avenue Sterling, MA 01564 / US | 02 /
Mahajan-Miklos, Shalina 882 Cedro Way Standford, CA 94305 / US | 03 /
Milne, G. Todd 169 Mason Terrace Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 04 /
Norman, Thea 1729 Bancroft Street San Diego, CA 92102 / US | [2012/26] |
Former [2010/44] | 01 /
Currie, Mark G. 18 Hall Avenue Sterling, MA 01564 / US | ||
02 /
Mahajan-Miklos, Shalina 882 Cedro Way Standford, CA 94305 / US | |||
03 /
Milne, G. Todd 169 Mason Terrace Brookline, MA 02446 / US | |||
04 /
Norman, Thea 1729 Bancroft Street San Diego, CA 92102 / US | Representative(s) | Simpson, Tobias Rutger, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Simpson, Tobias Rutger, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10170038.3 | 28.01.2004 | [2010/44] | Priority number, date | US20030443098P | 28.01.2003 Original published format: US 443098 P | US20030471288P | 15.05.2003 Original published format: US 471288 P | US20030519460P | 12.11.2003 Original published format: US 519460 P | [2010/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2246360 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2246360 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, C07K14/245, A61K38/10, A61P1/00, A61P9/00, A61P11/00, A61P13/08, A61P29/00, A61P3/04, A61K38/16 | [2010/44] | CPC: |
C07K7/08 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/10 (RU);
A61P1/00 (EP,RU);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P3/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Extension states | AL | 03.05.2011 | LT | 03.05.2011 | LV | 03.05.2011 | MK | 03.05.2011 | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung von Magen-Darm-Störungen | [2010/44] | English: | Compositions for the treatment of gastrointestinal disorders | [2010/44] | French: | Compositions pour le traitement de troubles gastrointestinaux | [2010/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04706011.6 / EP1594517 | EP07011869.0 / EP1911763 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040706011) is 06.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2013
16.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2013
16.04.2013
ADMISSIBLE Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.03.2013
Generics [UK] Limited (trading as Mylan) Albany Gate Darkes Lane Potters Bar Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB Opponent's representative Gallafent, Alison Alison Gallafent Ltd 4 George Street Llandeilo, South Wales SA19 6AS / GB | 06.05.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.01.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.07.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.07.2015 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.01.2019 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/12] | Appeal following opposition | 23.09.2015 | Appeal received No. T1892/15 | 02.12.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.01.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 19.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - MOSELEY S L ET AL, "Isolation and nucleotide sequence determination of a gene encoding a heat-stable enterotoxin of E. coli", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY. WASHINGTON, (19830101), vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 1167 - 1174, XP002994093 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - SHAILUBHAI K, "THERAPEUTIC APPLICATIONS OF GUANYLATE CYCLASE-C RECEPTOR AGONISTS", CURRENT OPINION IN DRUG DISCOVERY AND DEVELOPMENT, CURRENT DRUGS, LONDON, GB, (20020301), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1367-6733, pages 261 - 268, XP001145443 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US3773919 | WO8805774 | US4767628 | EP0467389 | US5134122 | US5140102 | EP0505322 | EP0507672 | US5192741 | WO9313128 | WO9324150 | US5273983 | WO9415587 | US5364842 | US5395490 | US5445832 | WO9528418 | US5510353 | US5587454 | WO9701351 | US5612052 | EP0507672 | WO9719927 | WO9721680 | US5672659 | WO9740085 | EP0835126 | EP0625162 | US5795864 | EP0505322 | US5824645 | EP0873753 | EP0876347 | US5859186 | US5891849 | US5893985 | US5969097 | US5994305 | US6054429 | US6087091 | US6136786 | WO0112233 | WO0119849 | WO0132180 | US2001006972 | WO0152844 | US6277862 | WO0164212 | US6333354 | WO02051435 | WO02062369 | WO02094187 | EP0835126 | FR2830451 | US2003078200 | US2003109417 | EP1321142 | WO03053432 | US6589750 | EP1336409 | US6620422 | WO03077897 | WO03097051 | - CAMILLERI, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2001), vol. 120, pages 652 - 668 | - TALLEY, GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1995), vol. 109, pages 1736 - 1741 | - DROSSMAN, DIG DIS SCI, (1993), vol. 38, pages 1569 - 1580 | - TALLEYET, AM J EPIDEMIOL, (1995), vol. 142, pages 76 - 83 | - DROSSMAN ET AL., "Rome Criteria", GUT, (1999), vol. 45, no. II, pages 1 - 81 | - RINGEL ET AL., ANNU REV MED, (2001), vol. 52, pages 319 - 338 | - KOLODZIEJ ET AL., INT J PEPT PROTEIN RES, (1996), vol. 48, page 274 | - HUNT ET AL., INT J PEPT PROTEIN RES, (1993), vol. 42, page 249 | - SMITH ET AL., J MED CHEM, (1978), vol. 21, page 117 | - LEDU ET AL., PROCEEDINGS NAT'L ACAD. SCI., (2003), vol. 100, pages 11263 - 78 | - SCHAFMEISTER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, page 5891 | - CHALTIN ET AL., HELVETICA CHIMICAACTA, (2003), vol. 86, pages 533 - 547 | - CALICETI ET AL., FARMCO, (1993), vol. 48, pages 919 - 32 | - BUTTERWORTH ET AL., J. MED. CHEM, (1987), vol. 30, pages 1295 - 302 | - KING ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2002), vol. 43, pages 1987 - 1990 | - NESTLER, MOLECULAR DIVERSITY, (1996), vol. 2, pages 35 - 42 | - FINN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1984), vol. 23, pages 2554 - 8 | - COOK ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1994), vol. 35, pages 6777 - 80 | - BROKX ET AL., JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2002), vol. 78, pages 115 - 123 | - GRIFFIN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, pages 6517 - 6531 | - ROBINSON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 5929 - 5934 | - SCHILLER, ALIMENT PHARMACOL THER, (2001), vol. 15, pages 749 - 763 | - N. ENGL. J. MED., (2003), vol. 349, page 941 | - SHALUBHAI, CURR OPIN DRUG DIS DEVEL, (2002), vol. 5, pages 261 - 268 | - VAANDRAGER, MOL CELL BIOCHEM, (2002), vol. 230, pages 73 - 83 | - KIM ET AL., NEUROREPRT, (2003), vol. 14, pages 1317 - 20 | - GUALILLO ET AL., FEBS LETTS, (2003), vol. 552, pages 105 - 9 | - FORTE ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1999), vol. 140, pages 1800 - 1806 | - GIANELLA, J LAB CLIN MED, (1995), vol. 125, pages 173 - 181 | - ROLFE ET AL., J PHYSIOLO, (1994), vol. 475, pages 531 - 537 | - ROLFE ET AL., GUT, (1999), vol. 44, pages 615 - 619 | - NZEGWU ET AL., EXP PHYSIOL, (1996), vol. 81, pages 313 - 315 | - LAZARO IBANEZ ET AL., BUR J PHARMACOL, (2001), vol. 426, pages 39 - 44 | - SOARES ET AL., BRITISH J PHARMACOL, (2001), vol. 134, pages 127 - 131 | - JAIN ET AL., BRAIN RES, (2001), vol. 909, pages 170 - 178 | - AMARANTE ET AL., EUR J PHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 454, pages 19 - 23 | - MOSELEY ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1983), vol. 39, page 1167 | - SO; MCCARTHY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4011 | - CHAN; GIANNELLA, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1981), vol. 256, page 7744 | - GUARINO ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1989), vol. 57, page 649 | - HUANG ET AL., MICROB. PATHOG., (1997), vol. 22, page 89 | - TAKAO ET AL., EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1985), vol. 152, page 199 | - ABDIKKAHI ET AL., FUNDAM CLIN PHARMACOL, (2001), vol. 15, pages 117 - 23 | - EDMUNDSON ET AL., CLIN PHARMACOL THER, (1998), vol. 63, pages 580 - 93 | - TAM ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1991), vol. 113, pages 6657 - 62 | - MOON ET AL., INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (1979), vol. 25, page 127 | - MORTEAU ET AL., DIG DIS SCI, (1994), vol. 39, page 1239 | - GUE ET AL., NEUROGASTROENTEROL. MOTIL., (1997), vol. 9, page 271 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1988), vol. 64, page 611 | - SIEGMUND ET AL., PROC. SOC. EXP. BIO. MED., (1957), vol. 95, pages 729 - 731 | - KESSLER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1970), vol. 245, pages 5281 - 5288 | - ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1976), vol. 72, pages 248 - 254 | - GIANNELLA ET AL., AM. J. PHYSIOL., vol. 245, pages G492 - G498 | - EUR. J. PHARM., (1992), vol. 219, page 445 | - J. BIOL. CHEM, (1987), vol. 262, page 8165 | - GIARDINA ET AL., DRUGS, (2003), vol. 6, page 758 | - BODEN, J MED CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 1664 - 75 |