EP2284371 - Exhaust gas purification apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Yoshifumi c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
Kato, Yoshifumi c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/19] |
Former [2011/07] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10170300.7 | 21.07.2010 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | JP20090182740 | 05.08.2009 Original published format: JP 2009182740 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2284371 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2284371 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N13/0093 (EP,US);
F01N3/0807 (EP,US);
F01N3/105 (EP,US);
F01N9/00 (EP,US);
F01N2560/026 (EP,US);
F01N2560/06 (EP,US);
F01N2570/14 (EP,US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | Abgasreinigungsvorrichtung | [2011/07] | English: | Exhaust gas purification apparatus | [2011/07] | French: | Dispositif de purification des gaz d'échappement | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 05.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2010 | AL | 09.05.2012 | AT | 09.05.2012 | BE | 09.05.2012 | CY | 09.05.2012 | CZ | 09.05.2012 | DK | 09.05.2012 | EE | 09.05.2012 | FI | 09.05.2012 | HR | 09.05.2012 | IT | 09.05.2012 | LT | 09.05.2012 | LV | 09.05.2012 | MK | 09.05.2012 | MT | 09.05.2012 | NL | 09.05.2012 | PL | 09.05.2012 | RO | 09.05.2012 | SE | 09.05.2012 | SI | 09.05.2012 | SK | 09.05.2012 | SM | 09.05.2012 | TR | 09.05.2012 | IE | 21.07.2012 | LU | 21.07.2012 | FR | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | BG | 09.08.2012 | NO | 09.08.2012 | GR | 10.08.2012 | ES | 20.08.2012 | IS | 09.09.2012 | PT | 10.09.2012 | DE | 01.02.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AL | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 09.05.2012 | ||
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MK | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
SM | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
LU | 21.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
DE | 01.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AL | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 09.05.2012 | ||
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MK | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
DE | 01.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 09.05.2012 | |
AT | 09.05.2012 | ||
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MK | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
DE | 01.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MK | 09.05.2012 | ||
MT | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
DE | 01.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MK | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
DE | 01.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MK | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
DE | 01.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MK | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
DE | 01.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
MK | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
NL | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
HR | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
LV | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
IS | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 09.05.2012 | |
LT | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
NO | 09.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 09.05.2012 | |
NO | 09.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009025368 (SAKIMOTO MASATSUGU [DE], et al)[A] 1; | [A]US2009173064 (REN SHOUXIAN [US], et al) [A] 1 | by applicant | JPH06509020 | JP2006009608 | JP2006274986 |