blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2280456

EP2280456 - Electrical connector having a dielectric insert for retaining an electrical contact [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.01.2012
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.02.2012  [2012/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2011/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Rossman, Jared Evan
6050 Lewisberry Road
Dover, PA 17315 / US
02 / Flickinger, Steven Lee
7107 Fox Meadow Drive
Hummelstown, PA 17036 / US
03 / Brandberg, Phillip Clay
131 Wagner Street
Carlisle, PA 17013 / US
 [2011/05]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/05]Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al
Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London
W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date10170784.226.07.2010
[2011/05]
Priority number, dateUS2009051090428.07.2009         Original published format: US 510904
[2011/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2280456
Date:02.02.2011
Language:EN
[2011/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2010
ClassificationIPC:H01R13/506, H01R13/424
[2011/05]
CPC:
H01R13/424 (EP,US); H01R13/4226 (EP,US); H01R13/506 (EP,US);
H01R43/20 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Steckverbinder mit einem dielektrischen Einlage zum Zurückhalten eines elektrischen Kontakts[2011/05]
English:Electrical connector having a dielectric insert for retaining an electrical contact[2011/05]
French:Connecteur électrique doté d'un insert diélectrique pour retenir un contact électrique[2011/05]
Examination procedure03.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/06]
08.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2012/06]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5571032  (SANO TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 16 - column 7, line 3 * * figures 11-19 * [I] 5,7;
 [XI]US4187272  (BOURDON NORMAND C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * the whole document * [I] 5,7;
 [XI]FR2508728  (BENDIX CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * the whole document * [I] 5,7;
 [I]EP2003737  (SOURIAU [FR]) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3090937  (KEITH JOHN T, et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6475037  (HARTING DIETMAR [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.