EP2283991 - Blow-moulding machine with cleaning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winzinger, Frank Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 02 /
Lappe, Ulrich Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2020/30] |
Former [2012/01] | 01 /
Winzinger, Franz Clermont-Ferrand-Allee 31 D-93049, Regensburg / DE | ||
02 /
Lappe, Ulrich Bedelgasse 18a 93059, Regensburg / DE | |||
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
Winzinger, Franz Ludwig-Thoma-Straße 31 93051, Regensburg / DE | ||
02 /
Lappe, Ulrich Bedelgasse 18a 93059, Regensburg / DE | Representative(s) | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Prüfeninger Strasse 1 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2020/30] |
Former [2011/07] | Bittner, Bernhard Hannke Bittner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ägidienplatz 7 93047 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10171847.6 | 04.08.2010 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | DE20091036922 | 11.08.2009 Original published format: DE102009036922 | [2011/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2283991 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2283991 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2283991 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/42, B08B9/00, // B29C33/72, B29C49/36, B29C49/12, B29C49/46, B29C49/48, B08B9/08 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
B29C33/72 (EP,US);
B08B9/00 (EP,US);
B29C49/12 (EP,US);
B29C49/42 (EP,US);
B29C49/4252 (EP,US);
B29C2049/4679 (EP,US);
B29C2049/4892 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/1212 (EP,US);
B29C49/36 (EP,US);
B29C49/42403 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | B29C49/42, // B29C33/72 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] |
Former [2011/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Blasformmaschine mit Reinigungssystem | [2011/07] | English: | Blow-moulding machine with cleaning system | [2011/07] | French: | Machine de formage par soufflage dotée d'un système de nettoyage | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 10.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2010 | AL | 22.07.2020 | CY | 22.07.2020 | CZ | 22.07.2020 | DK | 22.07.2020 | EE | 22.07.2020 | ES | 22.07.2020 | FI | 22.07.2020 | HR | 22.07.2020 | LT | 22.07.2020 | LV | 22.07.2020 | MC | 22.07.2020 | MK | 22.07.2020 | MT | 22.07.2020 | NL | 22.07.2020 | RO | 22.07.2020 | SE | 22.07.2020 | SI | 22.07.2020 | SK | 22.07.2020 | SM | 22.07.2020 | TR | 22.07.2020 | AT | 04.08.2020 | IE | 04.08.2020 | LU | 04.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | CH | 31.08.2020 | LI | 31.08.2020 | BG | 22.10.2020 | GB | 22.10.2020 | NO | 22.10.2020 | GR | 23.10.2020 | IS | 22.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.08.2010 | |
AL | 22.07.2020 | ||
CY | 22.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
MT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
AT | 04.08.2020 | ||
IE | 04.08.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
GB | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
TR | 22.07.2020 | ||
AT | 04.08.2020 | ||
IE | 04.08.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
GB | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
AT | 04.08.2020 | ||
IE | 04.08.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
GB | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 04.08.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
GB | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
IE | 04.08.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SI | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SK | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 22.07.2020 | |
CZ | 22.07.2020 | ||
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 22.07.2020 | |
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
MC | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
SM | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 22.07.2020 | |
DK | 22.07.2020 | ||
EE | 22.07.2020 | ||
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
RO | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | DK | 22.07.2020 | |
ES | 22.07.2020 | ||
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
LU | 04.08.2020 | ||
CH | 31.08.2020 | ||
LI | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
NL | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
HR | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
LV | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
IS | 22.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
GR | 23.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 22.07.2020 | |
FI | 22.07.2020 | ||
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
SE | 22.07.2020 | ||
BG | 22.10.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 22.07.2020 | |
LT | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3650678 (HANSEN GERHARD) [X] 1,2,5,8,12,13 * figures 1,6; claim 1 * * column 1, lines 39-48,63-67 * * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 6 *; | [Y]DE3515255 (WEICHAND BERND [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,12,13 * figures 1,2; claim 1 * * column 6, lines 46-63 *; | [Y]DE69126877T (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [Y] 1,12 * claims 1,3 *; | [Y]DE29720311U (KRONSEDER MASCHF KRONES [DE]) [Y] 3,10,11 * page 4, lines 21-25; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP1186399 (AQUA SONIC SERVICE CO LTD [TH]) [Y] 1,12* paragraphs [0013] , [0016] , [0017] , [0018]; figures 1,2,5 *; | [XDYI]DE10064167 (KRONES AG [DE]) [XD] 1,2,4,5,7-9,12,13 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] , [0038] - [0042] - [0045] , [0046]; figures 1,2; claims 1,13,14,17,23-26 * [Y] 1-3,5,10-13 [I] 6; | [Y]DE20308513U (KRONES AG [DE]) [Y] 3,10,11 * paragraph [0012]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US6808379 (YOO CHEOL JOON [KR]) [Y] 1,12 * claims 1,7 * | Examination | US6984360 | DE202008005257U | by applicant | DE20023423U | WO2008125216 | DE102009021792 | WO2009EP59923 |