EP2273330 - Home appliance control system and methods in a networked environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Electronics, Inc. 201 E. Sandpointe Avenue, 8th Floor Santa Ana, CA 92707 / US | [2012/41] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states UNIVERSAL ELECTRONICS, INC. 6101 Gateway Drive Cypress, CA 90630-4841 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arling, Paul D 71 New Dawn Irvine, CA 92620 / US | 02 /
Black, Jeremy K 6101 Gateway Drive Cypress, CA 90630-4841 / US | 03 /
Chambers, Christopher 7108 Katella Avenue, 380 Stanton, CA 90680 / US | 04 /
Dresti, Mauro 6101 Gateway Drive Cypress, CA 90630-4841 / US | 05 /
Hayes, Patrick H 22981 Arija Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | 06 /
Lilleness, Robert 6101 Gateway Drive Cypress, CA 90630-4841 / US | 07 /
Scott, Wayne 50 Crooked Stick Drive Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | 08 /
Yuh, Allen 1456 Maple Hill Road Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | [2014/02] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
Arling, Paul D 71 New Dawn Irvine, CA 92620 / US | ||
02 /
Black, Jeremy K 6101 Gateway Drive Cypress, CA 90630-4841 / US | |||
03 /
Chambers, Christopher 7108 Katella Avenue, 380 Stanton, CA 90680 / US | |||
04 /
Dresti, Mauro 6101 Gateway Drive Cypress, CA 90630-4841 / US | |||
05 /
Hayes, Patrick H 22981 Arija Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | |||
06 /
Lilleness, Robert 6101 Gateway Drive Cypress, CA 90630-4841 / US | |||
07 /
Scott, Wayne 50 Crooked Stick Drive Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | |||
08 /
Yuh, Allen 1456 Maple Hill Road Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | |||
Former [2011/02] | 01 /
Arling, Paul D 71 New Dawn Irvine, CA 92620 / US | ||
02 /
Black, Jeremy K 6101 Gateway Drive Cypress, CA 90630-4841 / US | |||
03 /
Chambers, Christopher 7108 Katella Avenue, 380 Stanton, CA 90680 / US | |||
04 /
Dresti, Mauro 917 South Easthills West Covina, CA 91719 / US | |||
05 /
Hayes, Patrick H 22981 Arija Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | |||
06 /
Lilleness, Robert 6101 Gateway Drive Cypress, CA 90630-4841 / US | |||
07 /
Scott, Wayne 50 Crooked Stick Drive Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | |||
08 /
Yuh, Allen 1456 Maple Hill Road Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US | Representative(s) | Cordina, Kevin John CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Cordina, Kevin John Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2011/02] | Cordina, Kevin John Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 10175855.5 | 02.11.2004 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | US20030517283P | 04.11.2003 Original published format: US 517283 P | US20040978860 | 01.11.2004 Original published format: US 978860 | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2273330 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2273330 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, H04L12/28 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
H04L12/2805 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (EP,US);
H04L12/282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/02] | Title | German: | Haushaltsgerätesteuerungssystem und Verfahren in einer vernetzten Umgebung | [2011/02] | English: | Home appliance control system and methods in a networked environment | [2011/02] | French: | Système de commande d'appareil ménager et procédés dans un environnement en réseau | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 16.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04800637.3 / EP1682955 | EP09172999.6 / EP2151723 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040800637) is 12.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.11.2004 | AT | 08.01.2014 | BE | 08.01.2014 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | ES | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | IT | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | SE | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/29] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
BE | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | IS | 08.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6148241 (LUDTKE HAROLD AARON [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 1, line 8 - column 11, line 11 *; | [X]US2003076240 (BAE YU SEOK [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0098] * * figures 2-4 *; | [X]EP1023650 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [X] 3 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] ** paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0063] * | by applicant | US4623887 | US4959810 | US5481256 | US5614906 | US5959751 | US6014092 | US6225938 | US6587067 | - INTEL TECHNICAL JOURNAL, (20021115), vol. 6, no. 4 | US20010287441 | US20010264767 | US20010905423 | US20010905432 | US20010905396 | US20030603839 | US20030665650 | US20030665642 | US20030517558 | US20030517237 |