EP2305134 - Surgical Instrument having a Removable Battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon Endo-Surgery, Inc. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242-2839 / US | [2011/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shelton, IV Frederick E. PO Box 373 New Vienna, Ohio / US | 02 /
Doll, Kevin R. 6110 Glen View Mason, Ohio / US | 03 /
Swayze, Jeffrey S. 7047 Birchley Drive Hamilton, Ohio / US | 04 /
Timperman, Eugene L. 10639 Silverbrook Drive Cincinnati, Ohio / US | [2012/35] |
Former [2011/14] | 01 /
Shelton, IV Frederick E. PO Box 373 New Vienna, Ohio / US | ||
02 /
Doll, Kevin R. 6110 Glen View Mason, Ohio / US | |||
03 /
Swayze, Jeffrey S. 7047 Birchley Drive Hamilton, Ohio / US | |||
04 /
Timperman, Eugene L. 10639 Silverbrook Drive Cincinnati, Ohio / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2011/14] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10177924.7 | 30.01.2007 | [2011/14] | Priority number, date | US20060344020 | 31.01.2006 Original published format: US 344020 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2305134 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2305134 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | [2011/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2305134 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/04 (KR);
A61B17/00 (KR);
A61B17/068 (KR);
A61B17/115 (KR);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/14] | Title | German: | Chirurgisches Instrument mit herausnehmbarer Batterie | [2011/14] | English: | Surgical Instrument having a Removable Battery | [2011/14] | French: | Instrument chirurgical ayant une batterie amovible | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 03.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07250372.5 / EP1813200 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070250372) is 20.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2007 | AT | 29.08.2012 | BE | 29.08.2012 | CY | 29.08.2012 | CZ | 29.08.2012 | DK | 29.08.2012 | EE | 29.08.2012 | FI | 29.08.2012 | LT | 29.08.2012 | LV | 29.08.2012 | NL | 29.08.2012 | RO | 29.08.2012 | SI | 29.08.2012 | SK | 29.08.2012 | TR | 29.08.2012 | BG | 29.11.2012 | GR | 30.11.2012 | IS | 29.12.2012 | PT | 31.12.2012 | IE | 30.01.2013 | LU | 30.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
TR | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
IE | 30.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CY | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
NL | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
PT | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
BE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
LV | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
IS | 29.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 29.08.2012 | |
LT | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO9222268 (AUTOGENESIS CORP [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4 [Y] 5-7; | [Y]WO9414129 (HEMOSTATIX CORP [US], et al) [Y] 6,7* abstract *; | [Y]EP1300117 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * paragraph [0081] * |