EP2301958 - Polypeptides having cellulolytic enhancing activity and polynucleotides encoding same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes Inc. 1445 Drew Avenue Davis, CA 95616 / US | [2011/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Kimberly 8322 Windswept Court Elk Grove, CA 95758 / US | 02 /
Harris, Paul 11927 342nd Avenue Carnation, WA 98014 / US | 03 /
Zaretsky, Elizabeth 14335 W. Windriver Lane Reno, NV 89511 / US | 04 /
Re, Edward 2031 Hopper Place Davis, CA 95616 / US | 05 /
Vlasenko, Elena 707 Hacienda Avenue Davis, CA 95615 / US | 06 /
McFarland, Keith 5219 Cowell Blvd. Davis, CA 95616 / US | 07 /
Lopes De Leon, Alfredo 5071 Veranda Terrace Davis, CA 95616 / US | [2014/12] |
Former [2011/13] | 01 /
Brown, Kimberly 8322 Windswept Court Elk Grove, CA 95758 / US | ||
02 /
Harris, Paul 11927 342nd Avenue Carnation, WA 98014 / US | |||
03 /
Zaretsky, Elizabeth 14335 W. Windriver Lane Reno, NV 89511 / US | |||
04 /
Re, Edward 2031 Hopper Place Davis, CA 95616 / US | |||
05 /
Vlasenko, Elena 707 Hacienda Avenue Davis, CA 95615 / US | |||
06 /
McFarland, Keith 5219 Cowell Blvd. Davis, CA 95616 / US | |||
07 /
Lopes De Leon, Alfredo 5071 Veranda Terrace Davis, CA 95616 / US | Representative(s) | Shenker, Paul Dhan Novozymes A/S Patents Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Shenker, Paul Dhan Novozymes A/S Patents Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [2011/13] | Shenker, Paul Dhan Novozymes A/S Patents Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Application number, filing date | 10180399.7 | 28.01.2005 | [2011/13] | Priority number, date | US20040540661P | 30.01.2004 Original published format: US 540661 P | [2011/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2301958 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2301958 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/37, C12N9/42, C11D3/386, D21C1/00 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
C07K14/37 (EP,US);
C11D3/38645 (EP,CN,US);
C12N1/12 (US);
C12N1/14 (US);
C12N1/16 (US);
C12N1/20 (US);
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12N15/63 (EP,US);
C12N9/2437 (EP,US);
C12N9/2445 (EP,US);
C12P19/02 (US);
C12P19/14 (CN,US);
C12P7/14 (US);
C12Y302/01021 (EP,US);
C12P2201/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2011/13] | C07K14/37, C12N9/42, D21C1/00, C12N15/82, C12P7/10, C11D7/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/13] | Title | German: | Polypeptide mit verstärkter zelluloseabbauender Wirkung und dafür kodierende Polynukleotide | [2011/13] | English: | Polypeptides having cellulolytic enhancing activity and polynucleotides encoding same | [2011/13] | French: | Polypeptides dotés d'activité d'amélioration de l'activité cellulolytique et polynucléotides les codant | [2011/13] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 27.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/13] | 04.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05722727.4 / EP1713825 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050722727) is 26.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 04.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 04.10.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2005 | AT | 19.03.2014 | CY | 19.03.2014 | CZ | 19.03.2014 | EE | 19.03.2014 | LT | 19.03.2014 | MC | 19.03.2014 | PL | 19.03.2014 | RO | 19.03.2014 | SE | 19.03.2014 | SI | 19.03.2014 | SK | 19.03.2014 | TR | 19.03.2014 | BG | 19.06.2014 | GR | 20.06.2014 | IS | 19.07.2014 | PT | 21.07.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
GR | 20.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
MC | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SI | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
PT | 21.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 19.03.2014 | |
CY | 19.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
PL | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
SK | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
RO | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
IS | 19.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
CZ | 19.03.2014 | ||
EE | 19.03.2014 | ||
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
BG | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.03.2014 | |
LT | 19.03.2014 | ||
SE | 19.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03070940 (OJI PAPER CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * abstract *; | [XP]EP1482033 (OJI PAPER CO [JP]) [XP] 1,3-7 * the whole document * * sequence 19 *; | [XP]WO2004031378 (NOVOZYMES AS [DK]) [XP] 1,3-7 * examples 1-9; claims 1-39; sequences 1, 6 *; | [X] - SALOHEIMO M ET AL, "CDNA CLONING OF A TRICHODERMA REESEI CELLULASE AND DEMONSTRATION OFENDOGLUCANASE ACTIVITY BY EXPRESSION IN YEAST", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, BERLIN, DE, (199710), vol. 249, no. 2, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 584 - 591, XP002053367 [X] 1,3-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1997.00584.x | [X] - LEV SOPHIE ET AL, "A mitogen-activated protein kinase pathway modulates the expression of two cellulase genes in Cochliobolus heterostrophus during plant infection.", PLANT CELL, (200304), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 835 - 844, XP002415198 [X] 1,3-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.010546 | [X] - GALAGAN J E ET AL, "The genome sequence of the filamentous fungus Neurospora crassa", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (20030424), vol. 422, no. 6934, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 859 - 868, XP002365858 [X] 1,3-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature01554 | [X] - "SubName: Full=Putative uncharacterized protein; SubName: Full=Related to cellulose binding protein CEL1;", UniProt, (20030601), Database accession no. Q873G1, URL: EBI, XP002618997 [X] 1 * the whole document * | [XP] - "C. cinereus GH-61.", Geneseq, (20040701), Database accession no. ADM97937, URL: EBI, XP002618998 [XP] 1 * the whole document * | [XP] - "GH-61 coding sequence.", Geneseq, (20040701), Database accession no. ADM97932, URL: EBI, XP002618999 [XP] 3 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO02095014 | WO9517413 | WO9522625 | US5223409 | WO9206204 | WO0056900 | WO9600787 | WO9533836 | WO0024883 | EP0238023 | WO9114772 | EP0458162 | US4435307 | US3844890 | EP0495257 | EP0531372 | WO9611262 | WO9629397 | WO9808940 | WO9407998 | EP0531315 | US5457046 | US5648263 | US5686593 | US5691178 | US5763254 | US5776757 | WO8909259 | WO9524471 | WO9812307 | WO9117243 | WO9117244 | JPH07203960 | WO9206209 | US2002164730 | US4106991 | US4661452 | EP0238216 | EP0258068 | WO0060063 | WO0032758 | WO9613580 | WO0034450 | WO0192502 | WO9502044 | WO9216634 | WO9201046 | JPH02238885 | WO8906279 | WO8906270 | WO9425583 | WO9219729 | WO9820115 | WO9820116 | WO9834946 | EP0305216 | EP0218272 | EP0331376 | GB1372034 | WO9506720 | WO9627002 | WO9612012 | WO9116422 | WO9205249 | WO9401541 | EP0407225 | EP0260105 | WO9535381 | WO9600292 | WO9530744 | WO9425578 | WO9514783 | WO9522615 | WO9704079 | WO9707202 | GB1296839 | WO9402597 | WO9418314 | WO9623873 | WO9743424 | WO9324618 | WO9510602 | WO9815257 | GB1483591 | WO9219709 | WO9219708 | WO9961651 | US6461837 | - HENRISSAT B., "A classification of glycosyl hydrolases based on amino-acid sequence similarities", BIOCHEM. J., (1991), vol. 280, pages 309 - 316 | - HENRISSAT B.; BAIROCH A., "Updating the sequence-based classification of glycosyl hydrolases", BIOCHEM. J., (1996), vol. 316, pages 695 - 696 | - "Pretreatment of biomass", HSU, T.-A., Handbook on Bioethanol: Production and Utilization, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (1996), pages 179 - 212 | - GHOSH, P.; SINGH, A., "Physicochemical and biological treatments for enzymatic/microbial conversion of lignocellulosic biomass", ADV. APPL. MICROBIOL., (1993), vol. 39, pages 295 - 333 | - "Ethanol production from renewable resources", GONG, C. S.; CAO, N. J.; DU, J.; TSAO, G. T., Advances in Biochemical Engineering/Biotechnology, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1999), vol. 65, pages 207 - 241 | - OLSSON, L.; HAHN-HAGERDAL, B., "Fermentation of lignocellulosic hydrolysates for ethanol production", ENZ. MICROB. TECH., (1996), vol. 18, pages 312 - 331 | - VALLANDER, L.; ERIKSSON, K.-E. L., "Production of ethanol from lignocellulosic materials: State of the art", ADV. BIOCHEM. ENG.LBIOTECHNOL., (1990), vol. 42, pages 63 - 95 | - HIGGINS, CABIOS, (1989), vol. 5, pages 151 - 153 | - WATERMAN ET AL., ADV. MATH., (1976), vol. 20, page 367 | - WILBUR; LIPMAN, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 726 - 730 | - BOLTON; MCCARTHY, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1962), vol. 48, page 1390 | - CUNNINGHAM; WELLS, SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - HILTON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 271, pages 4699 - 4708 | - DE VOS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 255, pages 306 - 312 | - SMITH ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 224, pages 899 - 904 | - WLODAVER ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1992), vol. 309, pages 59 - 64 | - REIDHAAR-OLSON; SAUER, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 53 - 57 | - BOWIE; SAUER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 2152 - 2156 | - LOWMAN ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1991), vol. 30, pages 10832 - 10837 | - DERBYSHIRE ET AL., GENE, (1986), vol. 46, page 145 | - NER ET AL., DNA, (1988), vol. 7, page 127 | - NESS ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 17, pages 893 - 896 | - FORD ET AL., PROTEIN EXPRESSION AND PURIFICATION, (1991), vol. 2, pages 95 - 107 | - SMITH ET AL., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 224, pages 899 - 904 | - WLODAVER ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1992), vol. 309, pages 59 - 64 | - VILLA-KAMAROFF ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1978), vol. 75, pages 3727 - 3731 | - DEBOER ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 21 - 25 | - "Useful proteins from recombinant bacteria", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (1980), vol. 242, pages 74 - 94 | - ROMANOS ET AL., YEAST, (1992), vol. 8, pages 423 - 488 | - GUO; SHERMAN, MOLECULAR CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 15, pages 5983 - 5990 | - SIMONEN; PALVA, MICROBIOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (1993), vol. 57, pages 109 - 137 | - GEMS ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 98, pages 61 - 67 | - CULLEN ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 15, pages 9163 - 9175 | - CHANG; COHEN, MOLECULAR GENERAL GENETICS, (1979), vol. 168, pages 111 - 115 | - YOUNG; SPIZIZIN, JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1961), vol. 81, pages 823 - 829 | - DUBNAU; DAVIDOFF-ABELSON, JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1971), vol. 56, pages 209 - 221 | - SHIGEKAWA; DOWER, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 742 - 751 | - KOEHLER; THORNE, JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1987), vol. 169, pages 5771 - 5278 | - YELTON ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 1470 - 1474 | - MALARDIER ET AL., GENE, (1989), vol. 78, pages 147 - 156 | - "Guide to Yeast Genetics and Molecular Biology", BECKER; GUARENTE, Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, INC., vol. 194, pages 182 - 187 | - ITO ET AL., JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1983), vol. 153, page 163 | - HINNEN ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1978), vol. 75, page 1920 | - TAGUE ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1988), vol. 86, page 506 | - FRANCK ET AL., CELL, (1980), vol. 21, pages 285 - 294 | - CHRISTENSEN ET AL., PLANT MO. BIOL., (1992), vol. 18, pages 675 - 689 | - ZHANG ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1991), vol. 3, pages 1155 - 1165 | - EDWARDS; CORUZZI, ANN. REV. GENET, (1990), vol. 24, pages 275 - 303 | - ITO ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 863 - 878 | - WU ET AL., PLANT AND CELL PHYSIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 39, pages 885 - 889 | - CONRAD ET AL., JOURNAL OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 152, pages 708 - 711 | - CHEN ET AL., PLANT AND CELL PHYSIOLOGY, (1998), vol. 39, pages 935 - 941 | - KYOZUKA ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 102, pages 991 - 1000 | - MITRA; HIGGINS, PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 26, pages 85 - 93 | - KAGAYA ET AL., MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS, (1995), vol. 248, pages 668 - 674 | - XU ET AL., PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 22, pages 573 - 588 | - GASSER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 244, page 1293 | - POTRYKUS, BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 535 | - SHIMAMOTO ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 338, page 274 | - HOOYKAS; SCHILPEROORT, PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1992), vol. 19, pages 15 - 38 | - CHRISTOU, PLANT JOURNAL, (1992), vol. 2, pages 275 - 281 | - SHIMAMOTO, CURRENT OPINION BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 158 - 162 | - VASIL ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 667 - 674 | - OMIRULLEH ET AL., PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 21, no. 41, pages 5 - 428 | - WISELOGEL ET AL., Handbook on Bioethanol, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (1995), pages 1 05 - 118 | - WYMAN, BIORESOURCE TECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 50, pages 3 - 16 | - LYND, APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 24/25, pages 695 - 719 | - T. SCHEPER,, Advances in Biochemical Engineering/Biotechnology, SPRINGER-VERLAG, vol. 65, pages 23 - 40 | - GHOSE, PURE AND APPL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 59, pages 257 - 268 | - LEVER ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1972), vol. 47, pages 273 - 279 | - VAN TILBEURGH ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1982), vol. 149, pages 152 - 156 | - VAN TILBEURGH; CLAEYSSENS, FEBS LETTERS, (1985), vol. 187, pages 283 - 288 | - HIMMEL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1986), vol. 261, pages 12948 - 12955 | - VENTURI ET AL., J. BASIC MICROBIOL., (2002), vol. 42, pages 55 - 66 | - BRIGHAM ET AL., Handbook on Bioethanol, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, pages 119 - 141 | - LEE, JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 56, pages 1 - 24 | - P.K. SMITH ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1985), vol. 150, page 76 | - LYND, L. R.; WYMAN, C. E.; GERNGROSS, T. U., BIOCOMMODITY ENGINEERING, BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (1999), vol. 15, pages 777 - 793 | - "Cellulose bioconversion technology", PHILIPPIDIS, G. P., Handbook on Bioethanol: Production and Utilization, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (1996), pages 179 - 212 | - RYU, D. D. Y.; MANDELS, M., "Cellulases: biosynthesis and applications", ENZ. MICROB. TECHNOL., (1980), vol. 2, pages 91 - 102 | - GUSAKOV, A. V.; SINITSYN, A. P., "Kinetics of the enzymatic hydrolysis of cellulose: 1. A mathematical model for a batch reactor process", ENZ. MICROB. TECHNOL., (1985), vol. 7, pages 346 - 352 | - RYU, S. K.; LEE, J. M., "Bioconversion of waste cellulose by using an attrition bioreactor", BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1983), vol. 25, pages 53 - 65 | - GUSAKOV, A. V.; SINITSYN, A. P.; DAVYDKIN, I. Y.; DAVYDKIN, V. Y.; PROTAS, O. V., "Enhancement of enzymatic cellulose hydrolysis using a novel type of bioreactor with intensive stirring induced by electromagnetic field", APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 56, pages 141 - 153 | - SHEEHAN, J.; HIMMEL, M., "Enzymes, energy and the environment: A strategic perspective on the U.S. Department of Energy's research and development activities for bioethanol", BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (1999), vol. 15, pages 817 - 827 | - LYND, L. R.; WEIMER, P. J.; VAN ZYL, W. H.; PRETORIUS, I. S., "Microbial cellulose utilization: Fundamentals and biotechnology", MICROBIOL. MOL. BIOL. REVIEWS, (2002), vol. 66, pages 506 - 577 | - SILVEIRA, M. M.; JONAS, R., "The biotechnological production of sorbitol", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2002), vol. 59, pages 400 - 408 | - NIGAM, P.; SINGH, D., "Processes for fermentative production of xylitol - a sugar substitute", PROCESS BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 117 - 124 | - EZEJI, T. C.; QURESHI, N.; BLASCHEK, H. P., "Production of acetone, butanol and ethanol by Clostridium beijerinckii BA101 and in situ recovery by gas stripping", WORLD JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 595 - 603 | - CHEN, R.; LEE, Y. Y., "Membrane-mediated extractive fermentation for lactic acid production from cellulosic biomass", APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 63-65, pages 435 - 448 | - RICHARD, A.; MARGARITIS, A., "Empirical modeling of batch fermentation kinetics for poly(glutamic acid) production and other microbial biopolymers", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2004), vol. 87, no. 4, pages 501 - 515 | - KATAOKA, N.; A. MIYA; K. KIRIYAMA, "Studies on hydrogen production by continuous culture system of hydrogen-producing anaerobic bacteria", WATER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 36, no. 6-7, pages 41 - 47 | - GUNASEELAN V.N., BIOMASS AND BIOENERGY, (1997), vol. 13, no. 1-2, pages 83 - 114 | - CHEN, Z.; HO, N. W. Y., "Cloning and improving the expression of Pichia stipitis xylose reductase gene in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (1993), vol. 39-40, pages 135 - 147 | - HO, N. W. Y.; CHEN, Z; BRAINARD, A. P., "Genetically engineered Saccharomyces yeast capable of effectively cofermenting glucose and xylose", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1998), vol. 64, pages 1852 - 1859 | - BEALL, D. S.; OHTA, K.; INGRAM, L. 0., "Parametric studies of ethanol production from xylose and other sugars by recombinant Escherichia coli", BIOTECH. BIOENG., (1991), vol. 38, pages 296 - 303 | - INGRAM, L. 0.; GOMES, P. F.; LAI, X.; MONIRUZZAMAN, M.; WOOD, B. E.; YOMANO, L. P.; YORK, S. W., "Metabolic engineering of bacteria for ethanol production", BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG, (1998), vol. 58, pages 204 - 214 | - ZHANG, M.; EDDY, C.; DEANDA, K.; FINKELSTEIN, M.; PICATAGGIO, S., "Metabolic engineering of a pentose metabolism pathway in ethanologenic Zymomonas mobilis", SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 267, pages 240 - 243 | - DEANDA, K.; ZHANG, M.; EDDY, C.; PICATAGGIO, S., "Development of an arabinose-fermenting Zymomonas mobilis strain by metabolic pathway engineering", APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1996), vol. 62, pages 4465 - 4470 | - WONG, K.K.Y.; TAN, L. U. L.; SADDLER, J. N., "Multiplicity of 13-1 A-xylanase in microorganisms: Functions and applications", MICROBIOL. REV., (1988), vol. 52, pages 305 - 317 | - "Significance of esterases in the degradation of xylans", TENKANEN, M.; POUTANEN, K., Xylans and Xylanases, ELSEVIER, (1992), pages 203 - 212 | - "Hemicellulases: Diversity and applications", BRIGHAM, J. S.; ADNEY, W. S.; HIMMEL, M. E., Handbook on Bioethanol: Production and Utilization, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (1996), pages 119 - 141 | - EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1994), vol. 223, pages 1 - 5 | - EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 232, pages 1 - 6 | - EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 237, pages 1 - 5 | - EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1997), vol. 250, pages 1 - 6 | - EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1999), vol. 264, pages 610 - 650 | - KOAZE ET AL., AGR. BIOL. CHEM. JAPAN, (1964), vol. 28, page 216 | - YOSHIDA, J. AGR. CHEM. SOC. JAPAN, (1954), vol. 28, page 66 | - HAYASHIDA ET AL., AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., (1977), vol. 42, pages 927 - 933 | - BERKA ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 96, page 313 | - BERKA ET AL., GENE, (1993), vol. 125, pages 195 - 198 | - GOMI ET AL., BIOSCI. BIOTECH. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 57, pages 1095 - 1100 | - BRIGHAM ET AL., Handbook on Bioethanol, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, (1995), pages 119 - 141 | - DARTOIS ET AL., BIOCHEMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1993), vol. 1131, pages 253 - 360 | - MONTENECOURT; EVELEIGH, ADV. CHEM. SER., (1979), vol. 181, pages 289 - 301 | - MALONE ET AL., ELECTROPHORESIS, (2001), vol. 22, pages 919 - 932 | - GIESECKE ET AL., JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY METHODS, (1992), vol. 38, pages 47 - 60 | - ALTSCHUL, J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - HENIKOFF, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - NIELSEN ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1997), vol. 10, pages 1 - 6 | - ZDOBNOV; APWEILER, BIOINFORMATICS, (2001), vol. 17, pages 847 - 848 | - SIGRIST ET AL., BRIEF BIOINFORM., (2002), vol. 3, pages 265 - 274 | - KATOH ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 30, page 3059 | - CHRISTENSEN ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, pages 1419 - 1422 | - CUMMINGS ET AL., CURRENT GENETICS, (1999), vol. 36, pages 371 - 82 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - LEVER, M., "A new reaction for colorimetric determination of carbohydrates", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1972), vol. 47, pages 273 - 279 | WO1998DK00299 |