EP2273379 - Apparatus and method for topography dependent signaling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rambus Inc. 1050 Enterprise Way, Suite 700 Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horowitz, Mark A. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 02 /
Barth, Richard M. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 03 /
Hampel, Craig E. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 04 /
Moncayo, Alfredo c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 05 /
Donnelly, Kevin S. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 06 /
Zerbe, Jared L. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/02] | 01 /
Horowitz, Mark A. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | ||
02 /
Barth, Richard M. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
03 /
Hampel, Craig E. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
04 /
Moncayo, Alfredo c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
05 /
Donnelly, Kevin S. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
06 /
Zerbe, Jared L. c/o Rambus Inc. Attn. Ms. Ann Williams 4440 El Camino Real Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2011/02] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10180625.5 | 16.10.2000 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | US19990420949 | 19.10.1999 Original published format: US 420949 | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2273379 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2273379 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, G06F13/16 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
G06F13/4291 (EP,US);
G06F12/0246 (US);
G06F12/1081 (US);
G06F13/102 (EP,US);
G06F13/1689 (EP,US);
G06F13/364 (EP,US);
G06F13/4072 (EP,US);
G06F13/4086 (EP,US);
G06F13/4234 (EP,US);
G06F13/4243 (EP,US);
G06F3/061 (US);
G06F3/0611 (US);
G06F3/0619 (US);
G06F3/0658 (US);
G06F3/0661 (US);
G06F3/0679 (US);
G06F3/0688 (US);
G11C16/32 (US);
G11C19/00 (US);
G11C5/04 (EP,US);
G11C5/063 (EP,US);
G11C7/1048 (EP,US);
G11C7/1072 (US);
G11C7/222 (EP,US);
H03K19/00384 (EP,US);
H03K19/018585 (EP,US);
G06F2206/1014 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/02] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren um von der topografie Abhängig zu signalisieren | [2012/09] | English: | Apparatus and method for topography dependent signaling | [2011/02] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour signalisation dépendant de la topographie | [2011/02] |
Former [2011/02] | Gerät und Verfahren um topografische Abhängigkeit zu signalisieren | Examination procedure | 15.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 21.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00975263.5 / EP1151387 | EP05025388.9 / EP1630681 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000975263) is 04.10.2005 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5926651 (JOHNSTON ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * column 1, line 30 - line 35 * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 12 * * column 3, line 20 - line 44 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 20 * * column 4, line 38 - line 45 * * claims 7,15 *; | [X]US5864506 (ARCOLEO MATHEW R [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 43 - column 5, line 45 *; | [X]US5887150 (SCHNEIDER THOMAS R [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 3, line 19 - line 67 *; | [A]US5185538 (KONDOH HARUFUSA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 15 - line 46 * * column 9, line 57 - line 63 *; | [A]WO9903106 (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5841296 (CHURCHER STEPHEN [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9907077 (STANFORD SYNCOM INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0897154 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |