EP2261713 - MULTI-POSITION FIBER OPTIC CONNECTOR HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADC Telecommunications, Inc. 13625 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344-2252 / US | [2010/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vongseng, Soutsada 1187 Park Place Shakopee, MN 55379 / US | 02 /
Smith, Trevor D. 18790 Vogel Farm Trail Eden Prairie, MN 55347 / US | 03 /
Blenker, Bernard 1650 130th Avenue NE Blaine, MN 55449 / US | 04 /
Barth, Michael K. 2119 West 89th Street Bloomington, MN 55341 / US | 05 /
Norris, Jeffrey J. 10519 Xylon Road Bloomington, MN 55438 / US | [2013/12] |
Former [2010/50] | 01 /
Vongseng, Soutsada 1187 Park Place Shakopee, MN 55379 / US | ||
02 /
Smith, Trevor D. 18790 Vogel Farm Trail Eden Prairie, MN 55347 / US | |||
03 /
Blenker, Bernard 1650 130th Avenue NE Blaine, MN 55449 / US | |||
04 /
Barth, Michael K. 2119 West 89th Street Bloomington, MN 55341 / US | |||
05 /
Norris, Jeffrey J. 10519 Xylon Road Bloomington, MN 55438 / US | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/50] | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10183098.2 | 13.06.2005 | [2010/50] | Priority number, date | US20040871555 | 18.06.2004 Original published format: US 871555 | [2010/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2261713 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2261713 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | [2011/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2261713 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44, G02B6/38 | [2010/50] | CPC: |
G02B6/3825 (EP,US);
G02B6/48 (KR);
G02B6/3897 (US);
G02B6/38 (KR);
G02B6/445 (EP,US);
G02B6/4452 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/50] | Title | German: | MEHRPOSITIONSHALTER FÜR LICHTWELLENLEITERSTECKER | [2010/50] | English: | MULTI-POSITION FIBER OPTIC CONNECTOR HOLDER | [2010/50] | French: | SUPPORT DE CONNECTEUR DE FIBRES OPTIQUES À POSITIONS MULTIPLES | [2010/50] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 12.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05771738.1 / EP1766452 | EP10158615.4 / EP2214043 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050771738) is 02.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.06.2005 | AT | 20.03.2013 | BE | 20.03.2013 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | DK | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | LT | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | NL | 20.03.2013 | PL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SE | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | TR | 20.03.2013 | IE | 13.06.2013 | LU | 13.06.2013 | BG | 20.06.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | IS | 20.07.2013 | PT | 22.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 13.06.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 13.06.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
BE | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0967498 (APPLIED FIBER OPTICS INC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0020]; figure 3b *; | [Y]EP0975180 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0135] - paragraph [0137]; figures 22,23 *; | [Y]JP2001013365 (FUJIKURA LTD, et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6227717 (OTT CONRAD L [US], et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]JP2002243981 (HIROSE ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-10 * abstract; paragraphs [0001,0002,0012,0016]; figures 1,2,3,4,9 *; | [A] - CHAPTER 13: Connectors ED - Jeff Hecht, UNDERSTANDING FIBER OPTICS (THIRD EDITION), PRENTICE-HALL, INC, NEW JERSEY, US, PAGE(S) 251 - 265, (19990101), ISBN 978-0-13-956145-0, XP007910183 [A] 1 * page 261 lines 1-2; figure 13.9 * | by applicant | US20030610325 | US20030613764 |