EP2285066 - Networked media station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2011/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kearney, Philip F. III 2970 Fruitdale Avenue San Jose, AZ 95128 / US | 02 /
Newberry, Robert, Dale Jr 30 South 12th Street San Jose, CA 95112 / US | 03 /
Robbin, Jeffrey, L 270 Frances Drive Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 04 /
Heller, David 2016 Jonathan Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | 05 /
Wysocki, Christopher, R 249 West Main Street Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | 06 /
Davis, Stephen, Anderson 17370 Melody Lane Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US | [2014/19] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
Kearney, Philip F. III 2970 Fruitdale Avenue San Jose, AZ 95128 / US | ||
02 /
Newberry, Robert, Dale Jr 30 South 12th Street San Jose, CA 95112 / US | |||
03 /
Robbin, Jeffrey, L 270 Frances Drive Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
04 /
Heller, David 2016 Jonathan Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | |||
05 /
Wysocki, Christopher, R 249 West Main Street Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | |||
06 /
Davis, Stephen, Anderson 17370 Melody Lane Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US | |||
Former [2011/07] | 01 /
Kearney, Philip F. III 2970 Fruitdale Avenue San Jose, AZ 95128 / US | ||
02 /
Newberry, Robert, Dale Jr 30 South 12th Street San Jose, CA 95112 / US | |||
03 /
Robbin, Jeffrey, L 705 Benvenue Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | |||
04 /
Heller, David 2016 Jonathan Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | |||
05 /
Wysocki, Christopher, R 249 West Main Street Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | |||
06 /
Davis, Stephen, Anderson 17370 Melody Lane Los Gatos, CA 95033 / US | Representative(s) | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/07] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 10184653.3 | 07.04.2005 | [2011/07] | Priority number, date | US20040862115 | 04.06.2004 Original published format: US 862115 | [2011/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2285066 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2285066 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/28, H04L12/66 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
H04L12/66 (EP,US);
H04L49/604 (EP,US);
H04L65/613 (EP,US);
H04L65/752 (EP);
H04L65/765 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | H04L29/06, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/07] | Title | German: | Vernetzte Medienstation | [2011/07] | English: | Networked media station | [2011/07] | French: | Station multimédia en réseau | [2011/07] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 16.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05731980.8 / EP1751949 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050731980) is 25.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.04.2005 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/01] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02065732 (SIMPLE DEVICES [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 13 - page 22 *; | [A]WO03009601 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0054] *; | [A]US2003045955 (JANIK CRAIG M [US]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0112] *; | [XI] - ROSENBERG J ET AL, "SIP: Session Initiation Protocol", 20020601; 20020600, (20020601), pages 1 - 269, XP015009039 [X] 1 * page 141 - page 142 * [I] 2,3 | [A] - D-LINK, "D-LINK'S NEW WIRELESS MEDIA DEVICE PLAYS DIGITAL MUSIC, VIDEOS, AND PHOTOS ON HOME TELEVISION AND STEREO", (20040120), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://presslink.dlink.com/pr/?prid=136, (20050629), XP002333857 [A] 1-3 * page 1 - page 2 * | [A] - LINKSYS, "New Linksys Wireless Home Products Showcased at CEBIT 2004", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20040318), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://www.broadbandbuyer.co.uk/Shop/PageTextDetail.asp?SetID=2&TextID=473, (20050826), XP002342357 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHULZRINNE COLUMBIA U A RAO NETSCAPE R LANPHIER REALNETWORKS H, "Real Time Streaming Protocol (RTSP)", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (199804), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015008110 [A] 1-3 * pages 5,10,78 * | by applicant | US20020102321 | US20020102174 | US20030496842 |