EP2273437 - Identification, categorization, and integration of unplanned maintenance, repair and overhaul work on mechanical equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services GmbH Herrenacker 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wetzer, Michael 631 Marlin Court Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | 02 /
Garrow, Gary, R. 810 East Harvard Burbank, CA CA 91501 / US | 03 /
West, David, P., II 27 Pembrooke Ct. Newnan, GA 30265 / US | 04 /
Weir, Patrick, E. 44 Midcrest Way San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 05 /
Newton, Charles, P., III 1279 Crooked Stick Drive Rock Hill, SC 29730 / US | 06 /
Ashby, Gary 92 St. John's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3NE / GB | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Penny, Daryl Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Penny, Daryl Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10185563.3 | 02.09.2002 | [2011/02] | Priority number, date | US20010946095 | 04.09.2001 Original published format: US 946095 | [2011/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2273437 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
G06Q10/20 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0631 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063112 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06313 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06315 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06316 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2011/02] | Title | German: | Identifikation, Kategorisierung und Integrierung für ungeplante Wartung-, Reparatur- und Überholungsarbeit für mechanische Ausrüstung | [2011/02] | English: | Identification, categorization, and integration of unplanned maintenance, repair and overhaul work on mechanical equipment | [2011/02] | French: | Identification, catégorisation et intégration de taches non planifiées de maintenance, de réparation et de révision relatives a un équipement mécanique | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 13.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2012 | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/13] | 15.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.11.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02779301.7 / EP1425692 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020779301) is 22.06.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - STATEMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NOTICE FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE DATED 1 OCTOBER 2007 CONCERNING BUSINESS METHODS - EPC / ERKLAERUNG GEMAESS DER MITTEILUNG DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS VOM 1.OKTOBER 2007 UEBER GESCHAEFTSMETHODEN - EPU / DECLARATION CONFORMEMENT AU COMMUNIQUE DE L'OFFICE EUROP, 20071101, (20071101), XP002456252 [L] * the whole document * | Examination | US5604899 |