EP2270544 - Deformation monitoring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/01] | A seismic measuring system including GPS receivers | ||
[2012/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NovAtel Inc. 1120-68th Avenue N.E. Calgary Alberta T2E 8S5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states NovAtel Inc. 1120-68th Avenue N.E. Calgary Alberta T2E 8S5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fenton, Patrick C. 1504 21st Street, N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2N 2N2 / CA | [2011/17] |
Former [2011/01] | 01 /
Fenton, Patrick C. 304 Sandringham Court Calgary Alberta T3K 3V6 / CA | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47-50 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/01] | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10185912.2 | 16.07.2004 | [2011/01] | Priority number, date | US20030488124P | 17.07.2003 Original published format: US 488124 P | US20040891800 | 15.07.2004 Original published format: US 891800 | [2011/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2270544 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2270544 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2270544 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/00, G01V1/26 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
G01V3/28 (EP,US);
G01V1/003 (EP,NO,US);
G01S19/05 (EP,NO,US);
G01S19/44 (EP,US);
G01V1/16 (EP,US);
G01V1/22 (EP,US);
G01V1/26 (EP,NO,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/01] | G01V1/26, G01V1/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Extension states | AL | 01.10.2010 | HR | 01.10.2010 | LT | 01.10.2010 | LV | 01.10.2010 | MK | 01.10.2010 | Title | German: | Beobachtungssystem für Deformationen | [2012/17] | English: | Deformation monitoring system | [2012/17] | French: | Système d'observations des deformations | [2012/17] |
Former [2011/01] | Seismisches Messsystem mit GPS-Empfängern | ||
Former [2011/01] | A seismic measuring system including GPS receivers | ||
Former [2011/01] | Système de mesure sismique doté de récepteurs de GPS | Examination procedure | 01.10.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 17.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04737961.5 / EP1646889 | EP09150329.2 / EP2040093 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040737961) is 03.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2004 | AT | 09.05.2012 | BE | 09.05.2012 | CY | 09.05.2012 | CZ | 09.05.2012 | DK | 09.05.2012 | EE | 09.05.2012 | FI | 09.05.2012 | IT | 09.05.2012 | PL | 09.05.2012 | RO | 09.05.2012 | SE | 09.05.2012 | SI | 09.05.2012 | SK | 09.05.2012 | TR | 09.05.2012 | IE | 16.07.2012 | LU | 16.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | BG | 09.08.2012 | GR | 10.08.2012 | ES | 20.08.2012 | PT | 10.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
LU | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
TR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
BG | 09.08.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
IE | 16.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
ES | 20.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
IT | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
RO | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
SK | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
EE | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
DK | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 09.05.2012 | |
BE | 09.05.2012 | ||
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 09.05.2012 | |
CY | 09.05.2012 | ||
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
PT | 10.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
SI | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
GR | 10.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 09.05.2012 | |
FI | 09.05.2012 | ||
PL | 09.05.2012 | ||
SE | 09.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 09.05.2012 | |
SE | 09.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4589100 (SAVIT CARL H [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 9 - line 51 * * column 4, line 43 - line 66 * * column 5, line 40 - line 44 * * column 6, line 34 - line 48 * * column 7, line 7 - line 11 * * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]US6067852 (ALBER CHRIS D [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 51 - line 57 * * column 7, line 22 - line 30 *; | [A]US6140957 (WILSON RAYMOND P [NZ], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 1 * * column 4, line 58 - line 61 * * column 6, line 51 - line 64 * * column 7, line 10 - line 27 * * figure 4b *; | [A]WO0155747 (GECO AS [NO], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 6, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 1 ** figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A] - HARIGAE M ET AL, "CONTROL OF LARGE SPACE STRUCTURES USING GPS-MODAL PARAMETER IDENTIFICATION AND ATTITUDE AND DEFORMATION ESTIMATION", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART I - COMMUNICATIONS, SCRIPTA TECHNICA. NEW YORK, US, (200304), vol. 4, part 1, no. 86, ISSN 8756-6621, pages 63 - 71, XP001141479 [A] 1-15 * pages 64,66,68 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ecja.10045 |