EP2444117 - Protective cap for a connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rahimy, Ismael Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Taunusstrasse 14 61169, Friedberg / DE | 02 /
Brandenburger, Torsten Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Haingrabenweg 5 61203, Reichelsheim / DE | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/14] |
Former [2012/17] | Richly, Erik, et al Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10188134.0 | 20.10.2010 | [2012/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444117 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/20 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
A61M39/20 (EP,US);
A61M39/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schutzkappe für einen Konnektor | [2012/17] | English: | Protective cap for a connector | [2012/17] | French: | Cape de protection pour un connecteur | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/17] | 06.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0441171 (WEX ROLAND [DE]) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 8 - line 36 * * column 4, line 8 - line 27; figure 1; claims 1,2,4,5 * [I] 10; | [X]EP0227219 (NIPPON MEDICAL SUPPLY [JP]) [X] 1,2,7 * page 4, line 9 - line 17; figures 1A-E *; | [X]WO2010115005 (BARD INC C R, et al) [X] 1,2,7,11 * paragraphs [0045] , [0051] , [0058] , [0061] , [0067]; figures 1,2,8-11 *; | [XYI]EP0186642 (VIGGO AB [SE]) [X] 1,6,7 * column 1, line 45 - line 48 * * column 2, line 15 - line 50; figure 1 * [Y] 14 [I] 12,13,15; | [Y]WO2007044760 (DSU MED CORP [US], et al) [Y] 14 * page 7, line 18 - line 31 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 9; figures 7,9,10 * | by applicant | US7763006 | WO2009123709 | WO2010034470 | WO2005037362 |