|
03.03.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.03.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.03.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
19.06.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
03.03.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
03.03.2015 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.09.2014 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.09.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
15.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2013 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
09.01.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.06.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
28.04.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2011 |
Invitation to indicate the claims and the subject-matter to be searched |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |