EP2336581 - Ball joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAMAX Holding GmbH & Co. KG Dr.-Rudolf-Kellermann-Strasse 2 35315 Homberg (Ohm) / DE | [2012/25] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Kamax-Werke Rudolf Kellermann GmbH & Co. KG Petershütter Allee 29 37520 Osterode am Harz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutz, Karl-Eduard Sonnenstraße 5 36325, Feldatal / DE | 02 /
Rühl, Reiner Hintergasse 4 35327, Ulrichstein / DE | [2016/02] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
Lutz, Karl-Eduard Sonnenstraße 5 36325, Feldatal / DE | ||
02 /
Rühl, Reiner Hintergasse 4 35327, Ulrichstein / DE | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [2016/02] |
Former [2011/25] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10192389.4 | 24.11.2010 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | DE20092014886U | 18.12.2009 Original published format: DE 202009014886 U | [2011/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2336581 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2336581 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2336581 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/06 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
B21K23/04 (EP,KR,US);
F16C11/0609 (EP,KR,US);
F16C2220/46 (KR);
F16C2326/01 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T403/32631 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2011/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kugelzapfen | [2011/25] | English: | Ball joint | [2011/25] | French: | Pivot à rotule | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 09.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2010 | AL | 13.01.2016 | CY | 13.01.2016 | DK | 13.01.2016 | EE | 13.01.2016 | FI | 13.01.2016 | HR | 13.01.2016 | LT | 13.01.2016 | LV | 13.01.2016 | MC | 13.01.2016 | MK | 13.01.2016 | MT | 13.01.2016 | PL | 13.01.2016 | RO | 13.01.2016 | RS | 13.01.2016 | SI | 13.01.2016 | SK | 13.01.2016 | SM | 13.01.2016 | TR | 13.01.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.04.2016 | IS | 13.05.2016 | PT | 13.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
MT | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
TR | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 13.01.2016 | ||
DK | 13.01.2016 | ||
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
MC | 13.01.2016 | ||
MK | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SI | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RO | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
SK | 13.01.2016 | ||
SM | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
EE | 13.01.2016 | ||
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 13.01.2016 | |
FI | 13.01.2016 | ||
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
LV | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
RS | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | FI | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.05.2016 | ||
PT | 13.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
LT | 13.01.2016 | ||
PL | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 13.01.2016 | |
HR | 13.01.2016 | ||
NO | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102006030725 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [X] 7,8,13 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0028]; figure 1 * [Y] 1-6,11,12,14,15 [I] 9,10; | [YD]DE4403584 (LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [YD] 1-6,14 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 31; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]EP1418349 (ZF LEMFOERDER METALLWAREN AG [DE]) [Y] 1-6,14 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-5 *; | [YA]US3255623 (RICKS BERNARD E) [Y] 5,6,11,12,14,15 * column 4, line 19 - line 50; figure 5 * [A] 1-4,7-10,13 | by applicant | DE4433762 | DE102007023245 | EP0667464 | DE102005014905 | DE202004005272U | WO2005021184 | WO2005051594 | WO2005106263 | EP0898090 | EP1446587 | DE19542071 | DE102006017373 | DE202008006650U | DE20218262U | DE202006001771U |