EP2319406 - Hyperspectral/multispectral imaging in determination, assessment and monitoring of systemic physiology and shock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HyperMed Imaging, Inc. 537 Steamboat Road Greenwich, CT 06830 / US | [2011/52] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Hyperspectral Imaging, Inc 537 Steamboat Road Greenwich, CT 06830 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Panasyuk, Svetlana V. 59 Ash St Weston Massachusetts 02493-1927 / US | 02 /
Freemann, Jenny E. 59 Ash Street Weston, MA 02493 / US | 03 /
Hopmeier, Michael J. 425 E. Hollywood Blvd. Mary Esther, FL 32569 / US | 04 /
Panasyuk, Alexander A. 140 Grant Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 05 /
Tracey, Brian H. 25 Marion Road Arlington, MA 02474 / US | [2011/27] |
Former [2011/19] | 01 /
Panasyuk, Svetlana V. 28 Saddle Club Road Lexington, MA 02420 / US | ||
02 /
Freemann, Jenny E. 59 Ash Street Weston, MA 02493 / US | |||
03 /
Hopmeier, Michael J. 425 E. Hollywood Blvd. Mary Esther, FL 32569 / US | |||
04 /
Panasyuk, Alexander A. 140 Grant Street Lexington, MA 02420 / US | |||
05 /
Tracey, Brian H. 25 Marion Road Arlington, MA 02474 / US | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/19] | Zeller, Andreas Jones Day Rechtsanwälte Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10192449.6 | 28.12.2005 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | US20040639315P | 28.12.2004 Original published format: US 639315 P | US20040639282P | 28.12.2004 Original published format: US 639282 P | US20050653081P | 16.02.2005 Original published format: US 653081 P | US20050653082P | 16.02.2005 Original published format: US 653082 P | [2011/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2319406 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/103, A61B5/026, A61B5/1455 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
A61B5/445 (EP,US);
A61B5/0059 (EP,US);
A61B5/0261 (EP,US);
A61B5/14552 (EP,US);
A61B5/412 (EP,US);
A61B5/416 (EP,US);
G01J3/0224 (EP,US);
G01J3/10 (EP,US);
G01J3/2823 (EP,US);
G01J3/32 (EP,US);
G01N21/31 (EP,US);
A61B5/0088 (EP,US);
A61B5/02 (EP,US);
A61B5/029 (EP,US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,US);
G01J2005/0077 (EP,US);
G01N2021/3144 (EP,US);
G01N2021/3155 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/19] | Title | German: | Hyper-/Multispektrumsbildgebung bei der Bestimmung, Beurteilung und Überwachung der systemischen Physiologie und Schock | [2011/19] | English: | Hyperspectral/multispectral imaging in determination, assessment and monitoring of systemic physiology and shock | [2011/19] | French: | Imagerie hyperspectrale/multispectrale pour la détermination, l'évaluation et la surveillance de la physiologie systémique et des chocs | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 14.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/16] | 06.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.06.2015 | 16.06.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05857613.3 / EP1835845 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050857613) is 24.11.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.08.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.08.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004116814 (STRANC MIROSLAW F [CA], et al) [Y] 5 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004240712 (ROWE ROBERT K [US], et al) [Y] 5 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0172216 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [Y] 5 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2007084099 (CLEAN EARTH TECH LLC [US], et al) [E] 1 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2005273011 (HATTERY DAVID [US], et al) [XP] 1 * the whole document * | [XY] - L. C. CANCIO ET AL., "Visible hyperspectral imaging: monitoring the systemic effects of shock and resuscitation", IEEE PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (2002), vol. 4614, pages 159 - 168, XP002621905 [X] 1-17 * the whole document * [Y] 5 | [X] - ZUZAK K J ET AL, "VISIBLE REFLECTANCE HYPERSPECTRAL IMAGING: CHARACTERIZATION OF A NONINVASIVE, IN VIVO SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING TISSUE PERFUSION", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20020501), vol. 74, no. 9, doi:10.1021/AC011275F, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 2021 - 2028, XP001132716 [X] 1,5-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac011275f | [X] - ROBERT GILLIES, JENNY E. FREEMAN, LEOPOLDO C. CANCIO, DEREK BRAND, MICHAEL HOPMEIER, JAMES R. MANSFIELD, "Systemic Effects of Shock and Resuscitation Monitored by Visible Hyperspectral Imaging", DIABETES TECHNOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, (20040705), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 847 - 855, XP002621906 [X] 1,2,5,16,17 * the whole document * | [X] - ZUZAK K J ET AL, "Noninvasive Determination of Spatially Resolved and Time-Resolved Tissue Perfusion in Humans During Nitric Oxide Inhibition and Inhalation by Use of a Visible-Reflectance Hyperspectral Imaging Technique", CIRCULATION, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, US, (20010101), vol. 104, doi:10.1161/HC4901.100525, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 2905 - 2910, XP002490049 [X] 1,5-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/hc4901.100525 | [XP] - MASAHIRO YAMAGUCHI, YURI MURAKAMI, NAGAAKI OHYAMA, HIROYUKI FUKUDA, MASANORI MITSUI, YASUO KUBOTA, "Multispectral Color Imaging for Dermatology: Application in Inflammatory and Immunologic Diseases", THIRTEENTH COLOR IMAGING CONFERENCE: COLOR SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, TECHNOLOGIES, AND APPLICATIONS, (200511), vol. 13, ISBN 0-89208-259-3, page 6PP, XP002621909 [XP] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6640130 | US2004236229 | US4885634 | US2004249290 | US2003040675 | US2004039269 | US2004015816 | - GREENMAN ET AL., LANCET, (2005), vol. 366, page 1711 | - K..GONO ET AL., "Appearance of enhanced tissue features in narrow-band endoscope imaging", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL OPTICS, (2004), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 568 - 77 | US20050717188 |