EP2336315 - Enzymatic encoding methods for efficient synthesis of large libraries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuevolution A/S Rønnegade 8, 5. 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | [2016/47] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Nuevolution A/S Rønnegade 8, 5th floor 2100 Copenhagen / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franch, Thomas Tjørnevej 26 3070 Snekkersten / DK | 02 /
Lundorf, Mikkel Dybro Nordvej 16 B 4000 Roskilde / DK | 03 /
Jakobsen, Soren Nyboe Jens Lillelundsvej 1.st.tv. 2920 Charlottenlund / DK | 04 /
Olsen, Eva Kampmann Skinderskovvej 96 2730 Herlev / DK | 05 /
Andersen, Anne Lee Sjællandsgade 14, 2. tv. 4100 Ringsted / DK | 06 /
Holtmann, Anette Langekærvej 42 2750 Ballerup / DK | 07 /
Hansen, Anders Holm Slotsfogedvej 3, st. th. 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | 08 /
Sørensen, Anders Malling Mørkhøj Parkalle 24e 2860 Søborg / DK | 09 /
Goldbech, Anne Guldbergsgade 6, 2. tv. 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | 10 /
De Leon, Daen Amager Boulevard 131, 5. th. 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | 11 /
Kaldor, Ditte Kivsmose Vandkarsevej 47A 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | 12 /
Sløk, Frank Abildgaard Callunavej 16 3450 Allerød / DK | 13 /
Husemoen, Birgitte Nystrup Castbergsvej 12 2500 Valby / DK | 14 /
Dolberg, Johannes Enghavevej 15, 2. tv. 1674 Copenhagen V / DK | 15 /
Jensen, Kim Birkebæk Voldumvej 30C 2610 Rødovre / DK | 16 /
Petersen, Lene Anyvej 13 3500 Vaerloese / DK | 17 /
Nørregaard-Madsen, Mads Ellebakken 5 3460 Birkerød / DK | 18 /
Godskesen, Michael Anders Plantagekrogen 8 2950 Vedbæk / DK | 19 /
Glad, Sanne Schrøder Viggo Barfoeds Alle 59 2750 Ballerup / DK | 20 /
Neve, Søren Ellevænget 4 2800 Lyngby / DK | 21 /
Thisted, Thomas 6736 West Lakeridge Road New Marrot, MD 21774 / US | 22 /
Kronberg, Tine Titilola Akinleminu Nørrevænget 11 3500 Værløse / DK | 23 /
Sams, Christian Thorsmosen 4 3500 Værløse / DK | 24 /
Felding, Jakob Ordruphøjvej 24, 1 2920 Charlottenlund / DK | 25 /
Freskgård, Per-Ola Örtugsgatan 50 603 79 Norrkörping / SE | 26 /
Gouliaev, Alex Haahr Brøndsted 223 3670 Veksø Sjælland / DK | 27 /
Pedersen, Henrik Lynge Bygade 12D 3540 Lynge / DK | [2017/29] |
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
Franch, Thomas Tjørnevej 26 3070 Snekkersten / DK | ||
02 /
Lundorf, Mikkel Dybro Nordvej 16 B 4000 Roskilde / DK | |||
03 /
Jakobsen, Soren Nyboe Jens Lillelundsvej 1.st.tv. 2920 Charlottenlund / DK | |||
04 /
Olsen, Eva Kampmann Skinderskovvej 96 2730 Herlev / DK | |||
05 /
Andersen, Anne Lee Sjællandsgade 14, 2. tv. 4100 Ringsted / DK | |||
06 /
Holtmann, Anette Langekærvej 42 2750 Ballerup / DK | |||
07 /
Hansen, Anders Holm Slotsfogedvej 3, st. th. 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | |||
08 /
Sørensen, Anders Malling Mørkhøj Parkalle 24e 2860 Søborg / DK | |||
09 /
Goldbech, Anne Guldbergsgade 6, 2. tv. 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | |||
10 /
De Leon, Daen Amager Boulevard 131, 5. th. 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | |||
11 /
Kaldor, Ditte Kivsmose Vandkarsevej 47A 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
12 /
Sløk, Frank Abildgaard Callunavej 16 3450 Allerød / DK | |||
13 /
Husemoen, Birgitte Nystrup Castbergsvej 12 2500 Valby / DK | |||
14 /
Dolberg, Johannes Enghavevej 15, 2. tv. 1674 Copenhagen V / DK | |||
15 /
Jensen, Kim Birkebæk Voldumvej 30C 2610 Rødovre / DK | |||
16 /
Petersen, Lene Anyvej 13 3500 Vaerloese / DK | |||
17 /
Nørregaard-Madsen, Mads Ellebakken 5 3460 Birkerød / DK | |||
18 /
Godskesen, Michael Anders Plantagekrogen 8 2950 Vedbæk / DK | |||
19 /
Glad, Sanne Schrøder Viggo Barfoeds Alle 59 2750 Ballerup / DK | |||
20 /
Neve, Søren Ellevænget 4 2800 Lyngby / DK | |||
21 /
Thisted, Thomas 6736 West Lakeridge Road New Market, MD 21774 / US | |||
22 /
Kronberg, Tine Titilola Akinleminu Nørrevænget 11 3500 Værløse / DK | |||
23 /
Sams, Christian Thorsmosen 4 3500 Værløse / DK | |||
24 /
Felding, Jakob Ordruphøjvej 24, 1 2920 Charlottenlund / DK | |||
25 /
Freskgård, Per-Ola Örtugsgatan 50 603 79 Norrkörping / SE | |||
26 /
Gouliaev, Alex Haahr Brøndsted 223 3670 Veksø Sjælland / DK | |||
27 /
Pedersen, Henrik Lynge Bygade 12D 3540 Lynge / DK | |||
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
Franch, Thomas Tjørnevej 26 3070 Snekkersten / DK | ||
02 /
Lundorf, Mikkel Dybro Nordvej 16 B 4000 Roskilde / DK | |||
03 /
Jakobsen, Soren Nyboe Frederiksvej 36, 4.tv. 2000 Frederiksberg / DK | |||
04 /
Olsen, Eva Kampmann Skinderskovvej 96 2730 Herlev / DK | |||
05 /
Andersen, Anne Lee Sjællandsgade 14, 2. tv. 4100 Ringsted / DK | |||
06 /
Holtmann, Anette Langekærvej 42 2750 Ballerup / DK | |||
07 /
Hansen, Anders Holm Slotsfogedvej 3, st. th. 2400 Copenhagen NV / DK | |||
08 /
Sørensen, Anders Malling Mørkhøj Parkalle 24e 2860 Søborg / DK | |||
09 /
Goldbech, Anne Guldbergsgade 6, 2. tv. 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | |||
10 /
De Leon, Daen Amager Boulevard 131, 5. th. 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | |||
11 /
Kaldor, Ditte Kivsmose Vandkarsevej 47A 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | |||
12 /
Sløk, Frank Abildgaard Callunavej 16 3450 Allerød / DK | |||
13 /
Husemoen, Birgitte Nystrup Castbergsvej 12 2500 Valby / DK | |||
14 /
Dolberg, Johannes Enghavevej 15, 2. tv. 1674 Copenhagen V / DK | |||
15 /
Jensen, Kim Birkebæk Voldumvej 30C 2610 Rødovre / DK | |||
16 /
Petersen, Lene Aarhus Plads 6, 1. th. 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | |||
17 /
Nørregaard-Madsen, Mads Ellebakken 5 3460 Birkerød / DK | |||
18 /
Godskesen, Michael Anders Plantagekrogen 8 2950 Vedbæk / DK | |||
19 /
Glad, Sanne Schrøder Viggo Barfoeds Alle 59 2750 Ballerup / DK | |||
20 /
Neve, Søren Ellevænget 4 2800 Lyngby / DK | |||
21 /
Thisted, Thomas Fjordskrænten 14 3600 Frederikssund / DK | |||
22 /
Kronberg, Tine Titilola Akinleminu Nørrevænget 11 3500 Værløse / DK | |||
23 /
Sams, Christian Thorsmosen 4 3500 Værløse / DK | |||
24 /
Felding, Jakob Ordruphøjvej 24, 1 2920 Charlottenlund / DK | |||
25 /
Freskgård, Per-Ola Örtugsgatan 50 603 79 Norrkörping / SE | |||
26 /
Gouliaev, Alex Haahr Brøndsted 223 3670 Veksø Sjælland / DK | |||
27 /
Pedersen, Henrik Lynge Bygade 12D 3540 Lynge / DK | Representative(s) | Aamand, Jesper L., et al Jesper Levin A/S Jægersborg Allé 93 2820 Gentofte / DK | [2017/29] |
Former [2014/33] | Aamand, Jesper L., et al Jesper Levin A/S Vedbaek Strandvej 341 2950 Vedbaek / DK | ||
Former [2011/50] | Aamand, Jesper L., et al Hjerrild & Levin A/S Vedbaek Strandvej 341 2950 Vedbaek / DK | ||
Former [2011/25] | Aamand, Jesper L., et al Hjerrild & Levin ApS Tuborg Boulevard 12 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 10192717.6 | 01.12.2006 | [2011/25] | Priority number, date | DK20050001704 | 01.12.2005 Original published format: DK 200501704 | US20050741490P | 02.12.2005 Original published format: US 741490 P | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2336315 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2336315 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2336315 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/10, C40B40/06, C40B50/06, C40B50/04, C40B40/08, C40B40/12, C40B40/14 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
C12N15/1068 (EP,US);
C12N15/1089 (EP,US);
C40B40/08 (EP,US);
C40B50/04 (EP,US);
C40B50/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | C12N15/10, C12Q1/68, C40B40/06, C40B50/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2011/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 22.08.2012 | BA | 22.08.2012 | HR | 22.08.2012 | MK | 22.08.2012 | RS | 22.08.2012 | Title | German: | Enzymvermittelnde Kodierungsmethoden für eine effiziente Synthese von grossen Bibliotheken | [2011/25] | English: | Enzymatic encoding methods for efficient synthesis of large libraries | [2011/25] | French: | Procédés de codage enzymatique destinés à la synthèse efficace de bibliothèques importantes | [2011/25] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 05.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06818144.5 / EP1957644 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060818144) is 12.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.06.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.08.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 30.08.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.09.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.09.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 01.09.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.09.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 05.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.05.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.12.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.12.2006 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | PL | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 01.12.2006 | |
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.12.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 19.07.2017 | |
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | PL | 19.07.2017 | |
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9222875 (CRAMER RICHARD D III [US], et al) [A] 14-17* the whole document *; | [X]WO9320242 (SCRIPPS RESEARCH INST [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * figure 2; claims 1-42 *; | [A]WO9506293 (SYMBICOM AB [SE], et al) [A] 14-17 * the whole document *; | [XD]WO0023458 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [XD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002072887 (SZALMA SANDOR [US], et al) [A] 14-17 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03078050 (NUEVOLUTION AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03078626 (NUEVOLUTION AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03078446 (NUEVOLUTION AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]WO03078627 (NUEVOLUTION AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 1; claims 1-23 *; | [XD]WO2004039825 (NUEVOLUTION AS [DK], et al) [XD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005008240 (BIOGEN IDEC INC [US], et al) [A] 14-17 * the whole document *; | [XD]WO2005058479 (PRAECIS PHARM INC [US], et al) [XD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005090566 (NUEVOLUTION AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2006048025 (VIPERGEN PHARMACEUTICALS APS [DK], et al) [XP] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XDP]WO2006053571 (RASMUSSEN PETER BIRK [DK]) [XDP] 1-13 * page 16, line 35 - page 17, line 5; claims 37,38 * * page 81, line 24 - line 29; figure 12 *; | [E]WO2006135786 (PRAECIS PHARM INC [US], et al) [E] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [XD] - HALPIN DAVID R ET AL, "DNA display I. Sequence-encoded routing of DNA populations.", PLOS BIOLOGY JUL 2004, (200407), vol. 2, no. 7, ISSN 1545-7885, page E173, XP002436101 [XD] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pbio.0020173 | [XD] - HALPIN DAVID R ET AL, "DNA display II. Genetic manipulation of combinatorial chemistry libraries for small-molecule evolution", PLOS BIOLOGY, XX, XX, (200407), vol. 2, no. 7, ISSN 1544-9173, pages 1022 - 1030, XP002424416 [XD] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pbio.0020174 | by applicant | US3719667 | US3840556 | US4683192 | US4683202 | US4800159 | US4965188 | US5432272 | EP0604552 | US5723598 | US5786461 | US5811238 | US5958691 | US6037120 | WO0023458 | EP0643778 | WO0120039 | WO0157248 | WO02074929 | WO02103008 | WO03078625 | WO03101972 | WO2004039825 | WO2004099441 | WO2005058479 | WO2005093094 | WO2006048025 | WO2006053571 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (1969), vol. 243, pages 3552 - 59 | - TEAGUE, S. J. ET AL., AGNEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (1999), vol. 38, pages 3743 - 3748 | - OPREA, T. I. ET AL., J. CHEM. INF. COMPUT. SCI., (2001), vol. 41, pages 1308 - 1315 | - HANN, M. M. ET AL., J. CHEM. INF. COMPUT. SCI., (2001), vol. 41, pages 856 - 864 | - BERGER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 28, pages 2911 - 2914 | - WASHINGTON ET AL., JBC, (2001), vol. 276, pages 2263 - 2266 | - VAISMAN ET AL., JBC, (2001), vol. 276, pages 30615 - 30622 | - Comprehensive Organic Functional Group Transformations, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER, (1995), vol. 1-6 | - DOLLE, R. E., MOL. DIV., (1998), vol. 3, pages 199 - 233 | - DOLLE, R. E., MOL. DIV., (1998), vol. 4, pages 233 - 256 | - DOLLE, R. E.; NELSON, K. H., JR., J. COMB. CHEM., (1999), vol. 1, pages 235 - 282 | - DOLLE, R. E., J. COMB. CHEM., (2000), vol. 2, pages 383 - 433 | - DOLLE, R. E., J. COMB. CHEM., (2001), vol. 3, pages 477 - 517 | - DOLLE, R. E., J. COMB. CHEM., (2002), vol. 4, pages 369 - 418 | - DOLLE, R. E., J. COMB. CHEM., (2003), vol. 5, pages 693 - 753 | - DOLLE, R. E., J. COMB. CHEM., (2004), vol. 6, pages 623 - 679 | - DOLLE, R. E., J. COMB. CHEM., (2005), vol. 7, pages 739 - 798 | - DOLLE, R. E; LE BOURDONNEC, B.; MORALES, G. A.; MORIARTY, K. J.; SALVINO, J. M., J. COMB. CHEM., (2006), vol. 8, pages 597 - 635 | - LIPINSKI, C. A.; LOMBARDO, F.; DOMINY, B. W.; FEENEY, P. J., "Experimental and computational approaches to estimate solubility and permeability in drug discovery and development settings", ADV. DRUG DELIVERY REV., (1997), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1016/S0169-409X(96)00423-1, pages 3 - 25, XP000892390 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-409X(96)00423-1 | - WILDMAN, S. A.; CRIPPEN, G. M., "Prediction of Physicochemical Parameters by Atomic Contributions", J. CHEM. INF. COMPUT. SCI., (1999), vol. 39, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1021/ci990307l, pages 868 - 873, XP001029973 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ci990307l | - HOLMES CP., J. ORG. CHEM., (1997), vol. 62, pages 2370 - 2380 | - RAJASEKHARAN PILLAI, V. N., SYNTHESIS, (1980), pages 1 - 26 | - R. O. SCHOENLEBER; B. GIESE, SYNLETT, (2003), pages 501 - 504 | - KIRLEY, T.L., "Reduction and fluorescent labeling of cyst(e)ine-containing proteins for subsequent structural analysis", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1989), vol. 180, doi:doi:10.1016/0003-2697(89)90422-3, page 231, XP024822024 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(89)90422-3 | - LEVISON, M.E. ET AL., "Reduction of biological substances by water-soluble phosphines: Gamma-globulin", EXPERENTIA, (1969), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1007/BF01899076, pages 126 - 127, XP008022604 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01899076 | - HALPIN; HARBURY, "DNA Display . Sequence-Encoded Routing of DNA Populations", PLOS BIOL., (200407), vol. 2, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pbio.0020173, page E173, XP002436101 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pbio.0020173 | - "DNA Display II. Genetic Manipulation of Combinatorial Chemistry Libraries for Small-Molecule Evolution", PLOS BIOL., (200407), vol. 2, no. 7, page E174 | - "DNA Display . Solid-Phase Organic Synthesis on Unprotected DNA", PLOS BIOL., (20040702), page E175 | - STEMMER ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 164, no. 1, pages 49 - 53 | - SOUTHERN, EM ET AL., NUCL ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, no. 8, pages 1368 - 1373 | - ALBERICIO, F.; CARPINO LA, METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1997), vol. 289, pages 104 - 26 | - CHU, BC ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1983), vol. 11, no. 18, pages 6513 - 6529 | - SAIKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, no. 4839, pages 487 - 491 | - ARAP, W. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 279, no. 5349, pages 377 - 80 | - TIETZE; LIEB, CURR OPIN CHEM BIOL, (1998), vol. 2, pages 63 - 371 | - STEMMER, NATURE, (1994), vol. 370, page 389391 | - CRAMERI ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, no. 6664, pages 288 - 291 | - SMITH, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, pages 1315 - 1317 | - WELLS ET AL., CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL, (1992), vol. 2, pages 597 - 604 | - MARKS ET AL., J.BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 16007 - 16010 | - WINTER ET AL., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 12, pages 433 - 455 | - MATTHEAKIS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD.SCI., (1994), vol. 91, pages 9022 - 9026 | - ROBERTS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD.SCI., (1997), vol. 94, pages 12297 - 302 | - DOYON ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, pages 12372 - 12373 | - MARGULIES, M. ET AL., NATURE, (20050915), vol. 437, no. 7057, pages 376 - 80 | - BRENNER; LERNER, PROC, NATL. ACAD. SCI, (1992), vol. 89, pages 5381 - 83 | - WELLS ET AL., RECENT, PROG. HORMONE RES, (1993), vol. 48, pages 253 - 262 | - HOOGENBOOM ET AL., IMMUNOTECH, (1998), vol. 4, page 20 | - BACA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1997), vol. 94, no. 19, pages 10063 - 8 | - PEDERSEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1998), vol. 95, no. 18, pages 10523 - 8 | - JASCHKE ET AL., CURR..OPIN. CHEM.BIOL., (2000), vol. 4, pages 257 - 62 | - JASCHKE ET AL., CURR. OPIN. CHEM.BIOL., (2000), vol. 4, pages 257 - 62 | - JAEGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD.SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 14712 - 7 | - BARTEL ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, pages 1411 - 8 | - SEN ET AL., CURR.OPIN. CHEM. BIOL., (1998), vol. 2, pages 680 - 7 | DK19520020020 |