|
11.07.2019 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
24.06.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.06.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2019 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2019 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.10.2018 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.10.2018 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.10.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2018 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
7 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.09.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
09.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.01.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2015 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.08.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2012 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.09.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.08.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2011 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2011 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.02.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
61 |