EP2401239 - POWDER INSULATING MORTAR, AND LAYERED INSULATING MORTAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Weber France Rue de Brie 77170 Servon / FR | [2021/34] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Weber France Rue de Brie 77170 Servon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DA SILVA, Claude 1 impasse André Romand F-93600 Aulnay sous Bois / FR | 02 /
LAMBLET, Marie 5 rue des Couronnes F-75020 Paris / FR | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [2021/34] |
Former [2012/01] | Lucas, Francois Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, quai Lucien Lefranc F-93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 10709913.7 | 26.02.2010 | [2021/34] | WO2010FR50334 | Priority number, date | FR20090051209 | 26.02.2009 Original published format: FR 0951209 | FR20090057004 | 08.10.2009 Original published format: FR 0957004 | [2012/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010097556 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2401239 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2401239 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C04B20/00, C04B28/02 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
C04B28/04 (EP);
C04B20/0032 (EP);
C04B2111/28 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/04, C04B14/185, C04B16/082, C04B20/008, C04B38/009 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B14/24, C04B16/08, C04B20/0076 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B20/0032 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B20/0076, C04B38/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PULVERISOLIERMÖRTEL UND SCHICHTFÖRMIGER ISOLIERMÖRTEL | [2012/01] | English: | POWDER INSULATING MORTAR, AND LAYERED INSULATING MORTAR | [2012/01] | French: | MORTIER ISOLANT PULVERULENT, MORTIER ISOLANT EN COUCHE | [2012/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 20.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 04.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2010 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | MK | 25.08.2021 | MT | 25.08.2021 | NL | 25.08.2021 | PL | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | SM | 25.08.2021 | TR | 25.08.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | IE | 26.02.2022 | LU | 26.02.2022 | BE | 28.02.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 26.02.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
TR | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 26.02.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
MK | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 26.02.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.02.2010 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | CZ | 25.08.2021 | |
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
BE | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 25.08.2021 | |
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
IE | 26.02.2022 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | CZ | 25.08.2021 | |
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
LU | 26.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | CZ | 25.08.2021 | |
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | CZ | 25.08.2021 | |
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 25.08.2021 | |
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 25.08.2021 | |
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | HR | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/12] | HR | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | LT | 25.08.2021 | |
BG | 25.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4234344 (TINSLEY JOHN M, et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0665195 (KNAUF WESTDEUTSCHE GIPS [DE]) [Y] 7,9,10 * abstract * * column 4, line 9 - line 18 *; | [Y]FR2861399 (SNF SAS [FR]) [Y] 7,9,10 * abstract * * page 8, line 16 - line 18 *; | [Y]CN100337967C (ZHAO HUI [CN]) [Y] 1,11 * page 6 - page 7 *; | [Y] - M.LOSIEWICZ,D.P.HALSEY,S.J.DEWS,P.OLOMAIYE,F.C.HARRIS, "An investigation into the properties of micro-sphere insulating concrete", CONSTRUCTION AND BUILDING MATERIALS, (1996), vol. 10, no. 8, pages 583 - 588, XP002536659 [Y] 1-14 * page 583, paragraph 4 - paragraph 5 * * figures 4,7,8; tables 3,5,6, * * page 587, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0950-0618(96)00022-0 | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "3M Scotchlite Glass Bubbles K Series S Series", 3M PRODUCT INFORMATION, (2003), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://multimedia.3m.com/mws/mediawebserver?66666UuZjcFSLXTtNXMEl8&_EVuQEcuZgVs6EVs6E666666--, (20090827), XP002536919 [Y] 1-6,8,11-14 * Table: Thermal Conductivity; page 3 * * Table: Particle Size; page 4 * | by applicant | WO9507177 | US2005058817 | US2005072056 | EP1678101 | EP1682731 | - JK COCHRAN, "ceramic hollow spheres and their applications", CURRENT OPINION IN SOLID STATE AND MATERIALS SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 3, page 474 | - J BERTLING, "hollow microspheres", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 27, no. 8, page 829 |