EP2414293 - A TABLET COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medentech Limited Clonard Road Wexford / IE | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAFFORD, Ulick Newtown Adamstown Enniscorthy County Wexford / IE | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | O'Brien, John Augustine, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Unit 4, The Courtyard Business Centre Orchard Lane Blackrock, County Dublin, A94 NV07 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | O'Brien, John Augustine, et al John A. O'Brien & Associates Third Floor, Duncairn House, 14 Carysfort Avenue Blackrock, Co Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 10712163.4 | 31.03.2010 | WO2010IE00017 | Priority number, date | US20090202737P | 31.03.2009 Original published format: US 202737 P | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010113144 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2414293 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/76, A01N25/08, A01N59/00 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
C02F1/76 (EP,GB,US);
A01N25/08 (GB);
A01N25/34 (EP,GB,US);
A01N59/00 (EP,GB,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/00, A01N25/34, A01N37/04, A01N59/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Title | German: | TABLETTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2012/06] | English: | A TABLET COMPOSITION | [2012/06] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PASTILLE | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 10.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3545807 (CHARBONNAGES STE CHIMIQUE [FR]) [Y] 1-40 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004076364 (PUR WATER PURIFICATION PROD [US], et al) [Y] 1-40 * page 7, lines 4-21 * * page 17: line 18: "isoamyl ceatate" * * page 28: line 5: "sodium bicarbonate" ** page 33: line 3: "tablet" *; | RU2299862 [ ] (SHEVCHENKO VLADIMIR IVANOVICH [RU]); | [Y] - SHEVCHENKO, V. I. ET AL, "Water disinfection composition", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 147:15478, URL: STN, XP002617709 [Y] 1-40 * abstract * | Examination | US2005031684 |