|
18.08.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.2023 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2023 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2023 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2023 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.05.2023 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.05.2023 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.05.2023 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2023 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.05.2023 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
32 |
|
22.05.2023 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Opposition |
32 |
|
22.05.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.05.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2023 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.05.2023 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.04.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2023 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2023 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2023 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2023 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2023 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.04.2023 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.02.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
23 |
|
15.12.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
23 |
|
22.06.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.06.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.06.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2022 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2022 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2020 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.07.2020 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
15.04.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2020 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
28 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2020 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.2019 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.2018 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2018 |
Rejection of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.10.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
21 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
55 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
30 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
16 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 007 |
Opposition |
154 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
26 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
23 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2016 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.02.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Reply from applicant/patentee regarding third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2012 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
88 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2011 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.05.2011 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.05.2011 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.05.2011 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
26.05.2011 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
26.05.2011 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.05.2011 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.12.2010 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.12.2010 |
Notification of defects in the demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
23.11.2010 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
23.11.2010 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.11.2010 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.11.2010 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
29.10.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2010 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.03.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
15 |
|
30.03.2010 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
18 |