EP2417655 - CATHODE MATERIAL FOR FLUORIDE-BASED CONVERSION ELECTRODES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karlsruher Institut für Technologie Kaiserstrasse 12 76131 Karlsruhe / DE | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FICHTNER, Maximilian Röhlichstrasse 31 68723 Oftersheim / DE | 02 /
HAHN, Horst Im Berggarten 14a 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 03 /
PRAKASH, Raju Albert-Einstein-Strasse 2 76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | [2012/07] | Application number, filing date | 10715108.6 | 03.04.2010 | WO2010EP02147 | Priority number, date | DE20091017262 | 11.04.2009 Original published format: DE102009017262 | [2012/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010115601 | Date: | 14.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2417655 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2417655 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/38, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M10/054, H01M4/58, C04B35/52, C04B35/628, B82Y30/00, H01M4/36 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C04B35/522 (EP,US);
C04B35/62839 (EP,US);
H01M10/054 (EP,US);
H01M4/364 (EP,US);
H01M4/381 (EP,US);
H01M4/388 (EP,US);
H01M4/582 (EP,US);
H01M4/625 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3203 (EP,US);
C04B2235/40 (EP,US);
C04B2235/405 (EP,US);
C04B2235/445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5454 (EP,US);
H01M2004/028 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/07] | H01M4/38, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M10/054, H01M4/58 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATHODENMATERIAL FÜR FLUORIDBASIERTE KONVERSIONSELEKTRODEN, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2012/07] | English: | CATHODE MATERIAL FOR FLUORIDE-BASED CONVERSION ELECTRODES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF | [2012/07] | French: | MATÉRIAU CATHODIQUE DESTINÉ À DES ÉLECTRODES DE CONVERSION À BASE DE FLUORURE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET UTILISATION DE CE MATÉRIAU | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 04.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.04.2010 | CY | 06.03.2013 | CZ | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | EE | 06.03.2013 | FI | 06.03.2013 | HR | 06.03.2013 | IT | 06.03.2013 | LT | 06.03.2013 | LV | 06.03.2013 | MC | 06.03.2013 | MK | 06.03.2013 | MT | 06.03.2013 | NL | 06.03.2013 | PL | 06.03.2013 | RO | 06.03.2013 | SE | 06.03.2013 | SI | 06.03.2013 | SK | 06.03.2013 | SM | 06.03.2013 | TR | 06.03.2013 | IE | 03.04.2013 | LU | 03.04.2013 | BE | 30.04.2013 | BG | 06.06.2013 | NO | 06.06.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | ES | 17.06.2013 | IS | 06.07.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
MK | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
SM | 06.03.2013 | ||
TR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 03.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 06.03.2013 | |
CZ | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
SM | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 03.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
SM | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 03.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
MT | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 03.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 03.04.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BE | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
NL | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
HR | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
NO | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
NO | 06.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2004051772 (UNIV RUTGERS [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 * * page 6, paragraph l - page 14, paragraph l * [I] 3; | [A]US2006035148 (BALAYA PALANI [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0051] - [0062] - [0087] - [0089]; example 11 *; | [A]US2003108480 (BAKER R TERRY K [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0029] - [0041] * * column 5, line 1 - column 8, line 49 *; | [AD] - BRADWAY F ET AL, "Carbon-Metal Fluoride Nanocomposites. STRUCTURE AND ELECTROCHEMISTRY OF FEF3:C", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, US LNKD- DOI:10.1149/1.1596162, (20030717), vol. 150, no. 9, ISSN 0013-4651, pages A1209 - A1218, XP002307880 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1596162 | [AD] - BADWAY F ET AL, "Carbon Metal Fluoride Nanocomposites. HIGH-CAPACITY REVERSIBLE METAL FLUORIDE CONVERSION MATERIALS AS RECHARGEABLE POSITIVE ELECTRODES FOR LI BATTERIES", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE, US LNKD- DOI:10.1149/1.1602454, (20030815), vol. 150, no. 10, ISSN 0013-4651, pages A1318 - A1327, XP002307881 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1602454 | [T] - PRAKASH R; MISHRA A K; ROTH A; KUBEL C; SCHERER T; GHAFARI M; HAHN H; FICHTNER M, "A ferrocene-based carbon-iron lithium fluoride nanocomposite as a stable electrode material in lithium batteries", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (20100115), vol. 20, doi:10.1039/b919097j, ISSN 1364-5501, pages 1871 - 1876, XP002588750 [T] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B919097J | Examination | - PRAKASH R ET AL, "A ferrocene-based carbon-iron lithium fluoride nanocomposite as a stable electrode material in lithium batteries", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20100115), vol. 20, doi:10.1039/B919097J, ISSN 0959-9428, pages 1871 - 1876, XP002588750 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B919097J | by applicant | US2004121235 | US6946110 | US6465132 | - J.-M. TARASCON; M. ARMAND, NATURE, (2001), vol. 414, page 359 | - S.-Y. CHUNG ET AL., NATURE MATERIALS, (2002), vol. 1, page 123 | - K. KANG ET AL., SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 311, page 977 | - M. ARMAND; J.-M. TARASCON, NATURE, (2008), vol. 451, page 652 | - Y. OUMELLAL ET AL., NATURE MATERIALS, (2008), vol. 7, page 916 | - P.G. BRUCE ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2008), vol. 47, page 2930 | - H. ARAI; SH. OKADA; Y. SAKURAI; J. YAMAKI, J. POWER SOURCES, (1997), vol. 68, page 716 | - BADWAY, F. ET AL., J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 150, page A1209 | - J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 150, page A1318 | - BERVAS ET AL., ELECTROCHEM. SOLID STATE LETT., (2005), vol. 8, page A179 | - H. LI; G. RICHTER; J. MAIER, ADVANCED MATERIALS, (2003), vol. 15, page 736 | - MAKIMURA ET AL., APP. SURF. SCI., (2006), vol. 252, page 4587 | - ELECTROCHEM. COMMUN., (2006), vol. 8, page 1769 | - LEONHARDT ET AL., CHEMICAL VAPOR DEPOSITION, (2006), vol. 12, page 380 | - EBESSEN ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 358, page 220 | - THESS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 273, page 483 | - JOSE-YACAMAN ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1993), vol. 62, page 657 | - KOLAEV ET AL., CHEM. PHYS. LETT., (1999), vol. 313, page 91 | - HU ET AL., ADV. FUNC. MATER., (2007), vol. 17, page 1873 |