EP2409424 - SATELLITE PAYLOAD WITH AIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/04] | PAYLOAD FOR A SATELLITE WITH AIS | ||
[2018/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National d'Etudes Spatiales 2 Place Maurice Quentin 75001 Paris / FR | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEMAITRE, Julia 8 rue Clémence Isaure 31000 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
RAIZONVILLE, Philippe 18 rue de Provence 31400 Toulouse / FR | [2018/20] |
Former [2012/04] | 01 /
LEMAITRE, Julia 8 rue Clémence Isaure F-31000 Toulouse / FR | ||
02 /
RAIZONVILLE, Philippe 18 rue de Provence F-31400 Toulouse / FR | Representative(s) | Gaillarde, Frédéric F. Ch., et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 31-33, rue de la Baume 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2012/04] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10715943.6 | 15.03.2010 | [2018/20] | WO2010FR50461 | Priority number, date | FR20090051674 | 17.03.2009 Original published format: FR 0951674 | [2012/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010106279 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2409424 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2409424 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
H04B7/1851 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUTZLAST FÜR EINEN SATELLITEN MIT AIS | [2018/01] | English: | SATELLITE PAYLOAD WITH AIS | [2018/01] | French: | CHARGE UTILE D'UN SATELLITE AVEC AIS | [2018/01] |
Former [2012/04] | NUTZDATEN FÜR EINEN SATELLITEN MIT AIS | ||
Former [2012/04] | PAYLOAD FOR A SATELLITE WITH AIS | ||
Former [2012/04] | CHARGE UTILE D' UN SATELLITE AVEC AIS | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 10.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2010 | AT | 16.05.2018 | CY | 16.05.2018 | CZ | 16.05.2018 | DK | 16.05.2018 | EE | 16.05.2018 | ES | 16.05.2018 | FI | 16.05.2018 | HR | 16.05.2018 | IT | 16.05.2018 | LT | 16.05.2018 | LV | 16.05.2018 | MC | 16.05.2018 | MK | 16.05.2018 | MT | 16.05.2018 | NL | 16.05.2018 | PL | 16.05.2018 | RO | 16.05.2018 | SE | 16.05.2018 | SI | 16.05.2018 | SK | 16.05.2018 | SM | 16.05.2018 | TR | 16.05.2018 | BG | 16.08.2018 | NO | 16.08.2018 | GR | 17.08.2018 | IS | 16.09.2018 | PT | 17.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 15.03.2010 | |
AT | 16.05.2018 | ||
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
IS | 16.09.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CY | 16.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
MT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
PT | 17.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
TR | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
MC | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SI | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
IT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
SM | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 16.05.2018 | |
CZ | 16.05.2018 | ||
DK | 16.05.2018 | ||
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
PL | 16.05.2018 | ||
RO | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
SK | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
EE | 16.05.2018 | ||
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 16.05.2018 | |
ES | 16.05.2018 | ||
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
NL | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
GR | 17.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
LV | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
HR | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
SE | 16.05.2018 | ||
BG | 16.08.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 16.05.2018 | |
FI | 16.05.2018 | ||
LT | 16.05.2018 | ||
NO | 16.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2007143478 (ORBCOMM INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-24 * page 12, line 1 - page 13, line 15 ** figure 4 *; | [X]US2008304597 (PEACH ROBERT [CA]) [X] 1-24 * paragraphs [0043 ] - [ 0071] * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | - INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION /ITU, RADIOCOMMUNICATION SECTOR, "ITU-R M.1371-3,Technical characteristics for an identification system using time division multiple access in the VHF maritime mobile band"" |