Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2393826

EP2393826 - NOVEL SAPONIN COMPOUNDS, METHODS OF PREPARATION THEREOF, USE THEREOF AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, SM, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Uniwersytet w Bialymstoku
ul. M. Sklodowskiej-Curie 14
15-097 Bialystok / PL
For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého v Olomouci
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
BioApex, s.r.o.
Slechtitelu 813/21
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
[2014/35]
Former [2011/50]For all designated states
Uniwersytet w Bialymstoku
ul. M. Sklodowskiej-Curie 14
15-097 Bialystok / PL
For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého v Olomouci
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
Bio Apex S.r.o.
Slechtitelu 813/21
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
Inventor(s)01 / MORZYCKI, Jacek Witold
ul. Zeromskiego 1 m. 8
PL-15-875 Bialystok / PL
02 / WOJTKIELEWICZ, Agnieszka
ul. Andrukiewicza 4 m. 67
PL-15-204 Bialystok / PL
03 / OKLESTKOVA, Jana
Olsany u Prostejova 145
79814 Olsany u Prostejova / CZ
04 / HOFFMANNOVA, Lucie
Prchalov 68
74258 Pribor / CZ
05 / STRNAD, Miroslav
Zapadni 25
77900 Olomouc / CZ
 [2011/50]
Representative(s)Gabrielova, Marta
Inventia s.r.o. Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2011/50]
Application number, filing date10721628.508.02.2010
WO2010CZ00012
Priority number, datePL2009038723509.02.2009         Original published format: PL 38723509
[2011/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2010088866
Date:12.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2393826
Date:14.12.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010
[2011/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2393826
Date:27.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/35]
Search report(s)International search reportEP18.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:C07J17/00, A61K31/58, A61P35/00
[2011/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUE SAPONINVERBINDUNGEN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, IHRE VERWENDUNG UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2011/50]
English:NOVEL SAPONIN COMPOUNDS, METHODS OF PREPARATION THEREOF, USE THEREOF AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS[2011/50]
French:NOUVEAUX COMPOSÉS DE SAPONINE, PROCÉDÉS POUR LES PRÉPARER, LEUR UTILISATION ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES[2011/50]
Entry into regional phase18.08.2011National basic fee paid 
18.08.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.2011Examination requested  [2011/50]
02.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2014Fee for grant paid
18.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.05.2014
Opposition(s)28.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
03.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.02.2010
AT27.08.2014
BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
SM27.08.2014
TR27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
[2017/38]
Former [2017/03]AT27.08.2014
BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2016/32]AT27.08.2014
BE27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/50]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/30]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
BE28.02.2015
Former [2015/24]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
IT27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
RO27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/16]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT27.08.2014
CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
HR27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY27.08.2014
ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
GR28.11.2014
PT29.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
BG27.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT27.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]  - WOJTKIELEWICZ AGNIESZKA ET AL, "New analogues of the potent cytotoxic saponin OSW-1.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY 26 JUL 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17608396, (20070726), vol. 50, no. 15, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3667 - 3673, XP002598620 [A] 1-12 * scheme 5; page 3670, column 2 * * page 3670, column 2, paragraph 5 * * page 3671; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JM0613572
 [A]  - SHI BINGFENG ET AL, "23-oxa-analogues of OSW-1: efficient synthesis and extremely potent antitumor activity.", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE (INTERNATIONAL ED. IN ENGLISH) 20 AUG 2004 LNKD- PUBMED:15368382, (20040820), vol. 43, no. 33, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 4324 - 4327, XP002598621 [A] 1-12 * page 4325, column 1, paragraph 1; compounds 1-3 * * page 4326; table 1 * * page 4326, column 2, paragraph 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200454237
 [A]  - MA X ET AL, "Synthesis of OSW-1 analogues and a dimer and their antitumor activities.", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS 20 AUG 2001 LNKD- PUBMED:11514158, (20010820), vol. 11, no. 16, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2153 - 2156, XP002598622 [A] 1-12 * page 2154, column 1; compounds 4,6 * * page 2155, column 1, paragraph 2; table 2 *
by applicant   - KUBO ET AL., PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 31, page 3969,
    - ZHOU ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST., (2005), vol. 97, page 1781,
    - ZHU ET AL., MOL. PHARMACOL., (2005), vol. 68, page 1831,
    - DENG ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1999), vol. 64, page 202,
    - GUO; FUCHS, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1998), vol. 39, page 1099,
    - YU; JIN, AM. CHEM. SOC., (2001), vol. 123, page 3369,
    - MORZYCKI; WOJTKIELEWICZ, CARBOHYDR. RES., (2002), vol. 337, page 1269,
    - XU ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT, (2003), vol. 44, page 9375,
    - LIU ET AL., ORG. CHEM., (2008), vol. 73, page 157,
    - TSUBUKI ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2008), vol. 49, page 229,
    - MORZYCKI ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (2001), vol. 57, page 2185,
    - GUO ET AL., BIOORG. MED. LETT., (1999), vol. 9, page 419,
    - MA ET AL., CARBOHYDR. RES., (2000), vol. 329, page 495,
    - MA ET AL., CARBOHYDR. RES., (2001), vol. 334, page 159,
    - MA ET AL., BIOORG. & MED. CHEM. LETT., (2001), vol. 11, page 2153,
    - DEN ET AL., J. CHEM., (2004), vol. 22, page 994,
    - MORZYCKI ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2004), vol. 14, page 3323,
    - DENG ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2004), vol. 14, page 2781,
    - MATSUYA ET AL., EUR. J. ORG. CHEM., (2005), page 797,
    - SHI ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (2005), vol. 70, page 10354,
    - TANG ET AL., BIOORG.& MED. CHEM. LETT., (2007), vol. 17, page 1003,
    - PENG, BIOORG.& MED. CHEM. LETT., (2007), vol. 17, page 5506,
    - TSCHAMBER ET AL., BIOORG.& MED. CHEM. LETT., (2007), vol. 17, page 5101,
    - WOJTKIELEWICZ ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (2007), vol. 50, page 3667,
    - BUDIHARDJO ET AL., ANNU. REV. CELL DEV. BIOL., (1999), vol. 15, pages 269 - 290,
    - ALLEN ET AL., CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI., (1998), vol. 54, pages 427 - 445,
    - CAIN ET AL., BIOCHIMIE, (2002), vol. 84, pages 203 - 214,