EP2451706 - CRAFT WITH CONTROLLED SPIN AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING SAID CRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesir Limited 9/10 The Crescent Wisbech Cambridgeshire PE13 1EH / GB | [2014/21] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Aesir Limited 6 The Furrows St Ives Cambridgeshire PE27 5WG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITCHER, Lee c/o Aesir Limited 6 The Furrows St Ives Cambridgeshire PE27 5WG / GB | 02 /
POTTER, Steve c/o Aesir Limited 6 The Furrows St Ives Cambridgeshire PE27 5WG / GB | 03 /
BABINSKY, Holger c/o Aesir Limited 6 The Furrows St Ives Cambridgeshire PE27 5WG / GB | 04 /
MCINTOSH, Simon c/o Aesir Limited 6 The Furrows St Ives Cambridgeshire PE27 5WG / GB | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Tolfree, Adam Joseph Benjamin, et al Tolfree Patents & Trademarks Toll Drove Manea, Cambridgeshire PE15 0JX / GB | [2014/21] |
Former [2012/20] | Tolfree, Adam Joseph Benjamin, et al Tolfree Patents & Trademarks Toll Drove GB-Manea, Cambs PE15 0JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 10733026.8 | 06.07.2010 | WO2010GB51114 | Priority number, date | GB20090011667 | 06.07.2009 Original published format: GB 0911667 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011004186 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2451706 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2451706 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B63H11/00, B63G8/16, B63C11/42, B64C39/06 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
B64C39/064 (EP,GB,US);
B64C29/00 (GB);
B64C39/001 (GB);
F15D1/00 (GB);
B63C11/42 (EP,US);
B63G8/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/20] | B64C39/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG MIT GESTEUERTEM DREHIMPULS UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE DES FAHRZEUGS | [2013/50] | English: | CRAFT WITH CONTROLLED SPIN AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING SAID CRAFT | [2012/20] | French: | VÉHICULE À SPIN CONTRÔLÉ ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DUDIT VÉHICULE | [2013/50] |
Former [2012/20] | WASSERFAHRZEUG MIT GESTEUERTEM DREHIMPULS UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE DES WASSERFAHRZEUGS | ||
Former [2012/20] | EMBARCATION ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'EMBARCATION À SPIN CONTRÔLÉ | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 07.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2013 | Observations by third parties | 17.07.2013 | Observations by third parties | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2010 | AL | 21.05.2014 | AT | 21.05.2014 | BE | 21.05.2014 | BG | 21.05.2014 | CY | 21.05.2014 | CZ | 21.05.2014 | DK | 21.05.2014 | EE | 21.05.2014 | ES | 21.05.2014 | FI | 21.05.2014 | HR | 21.05.2014 | IT | 21.05.2014 | LT | 21.05.2014 | LV | 21.05.2014 | MC | 21.05.2014 | MK | 21.05.2014 | MT | 21.05.2014 | NL | 21.05.2014 | PL | 21.05.2014 | RO | 21.05.2014 | SE | 21.05.2014 | SI | 21.05.2014 | SK | 21.05.2014 | SM | 21.05.2014 | TR | 21.05.2014 | IE | 06.07.2014 | LU | 06.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | NO | 21.08.2014 | GR | 22.08.2014 | IS | 21.09.2014 | PT | 22.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 06.07.2010 | |
AT | 21.05.2014 | ||
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MK | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
TR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 06.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 06.07.2010 | |
AT | 21.05.2014 | ||
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
TR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 06.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.07.2010 | |
AT | 21.05.2014 | ||
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 06.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CY | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 06.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
BG | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
MT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 06.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
SM | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 06.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
MC | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 06.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 06.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SI | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 06.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
IT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 06.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 06.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 06.07.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
NL | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
RO | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
EE | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
SK | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
BE | 21.05.2014 | ||
DK | 21.05.2014 | ||
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
PT | 22.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 21.05.2014 | |
ES | 21.05.2014 | ||
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 21.05.2014 | |
FI | 21.05.2014 | ||
HR | 21.05.2014 | ||
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
LV | 21.05.2014 | ||
PL | 21.05.2014 | ||
SE | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
GR | 22.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 21.05.2014 | |
LT | 21.05.2014 | ||
NO | 21.08.2014 | ||
IS | 21.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 21.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0047470 (MILDE KARL F JR [US]) [A] 1,16 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 2; figure 1 *; | [AD]GB2424400 (GFS PROJECTS LTD [GB]) [AD] 1,16 * page 3, line 23 - line 25 * * page 4, line 14 - line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3051415 (MEADOWS FROST JOHN CARVER, et al) [A] 1,16 * column 11, line 29 - line 47 * * column 15, line 60 - column 16, line 11; figures 1,4,8,11 *; | [A]JPS61122447 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [A] 1,16 * abstract *; | [A]US2927746 (ROY MELLEN WALTER) [A] 1,16 * figures 1,10 * | Examination | GB2387158 | US3104853 | by applicant | US5203521 | US5803199 | WO2006100526 | GB2387158 | other | GB2387158 | - COLLINS B., "Coanda Flight Controls", COANDA FLIGHT CONTROLS, (2000), pages 1 - 29, XP003033231 |