|
25.05.2021 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Decision revoking the European Patent (patent proprietor) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Decision revoking the European patent (opponent) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.02.2021 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.10.2020 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2020 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2020 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.05.2020 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.05.2020 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.03.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.03.2020 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.03.2020 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2020 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2020 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2019 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2019 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2019 |
F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.01.2019 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.01.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2018 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
20.09.2017 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
19.09.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
30.05.2017 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.05.2017 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2017 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
28.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
08.03.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.03.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.03.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
23 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
20 |
|
13.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.2016 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
28 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
77 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
60 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
66 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
51 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
40 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
108 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
116 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
17.04.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2014 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
12.12.2013 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2012 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.01.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.01.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.10.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
42 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |