EP2391942 - VIRTUAL SERVICE PROVIDER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Headwater Partners I LLC 1011 Pruitt Place Tyler, TX 75703 / US | [2016/37] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states Headwater Partners I LLC 555 Twin Dolphin Drive, Suite 310 Redwood City CA 94065 / US | ||
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states Headwater Partners I LLC 350 Marine Parkway, Suite 300 Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RALEIGH, Gregory, G. 131 Fox Hollow Rd. Woodside CA 94062 / US | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2014/46] |
Former [2011/49] | Bergstrand, Mikael Gudmundsson Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 10736226.1 | 19.01.2010 | [2015/52] | WO2010US21381 | Priority number, date | US20090380783 | 02.03.2009 Original published format: US 380783 | US20090206944P | 04.02.2009 Original published format: US 206944 P | US20090207739P | 13.02.2009 Original published format: US 207739 P | US20090207393P | 10.02.2009 Original published format: US 207393 P | US20090206354P | 28.01.2009 Original published format: US 206354 P | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010088094 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2391942 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2391942 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04W4/20 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
H04W12/08 (EP,CN,US);
H04L41/0894 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L41/5003 (EP,CN,US);
H04L63/20 (US);
G06F15/177 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06315 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q10/06375 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q20/32 (EP);
G06Q20/40 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q30/0207 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q30/0241 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q30/0284 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q40/12 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q50/40 (KR);
H04L12/14 (EP,CN,US);
H04L12/1407 (EP,KR);
H04L12/1432 (KR);
H04L41/0806 (US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L41/5029 (KR);
H04L41/5054 (US);
H04L47/20 (US);
H04L47/2408 (EP,US);
H04L51/046 (EP,US);
H04L63/0236 (EP,CN,US);
H04L63/04 (US);
H04L63/0428 (US);
H04L63/08 (US);
H04L63/0853 (US);
H04L63/0892 (US);
H04L63/10 (US);
H04L67/145 (US);
H04L67/306 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/51 (EP);
H04L67/55 (US);
H04L67/63 (EP,CN,US);
H04L9/32 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (US);
H04M15/00 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/49 (EP);
H04M15/58 (EP,CN,US);
H04M15/61 (EP,US);
H04M15/66 (EP);
H04M15/80 (EP,US);
H04M15/8055 (EP);
H04M15/88 (EP,US);
H04W12/00 (US);
H04W12/02 (US);
H04W12/037 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (US);
H04W12/37 (EP);
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04W28/02 (EP,US);
H04W28/0215 (US);
H04W28/0268 (EP,US);
H04W28/12 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (CN,US);
H04W4/12 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/18 (CN,US);
H04W4/20 (CN,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/50 (EP,CN,US);
H04W48/14 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W72/0453 (EP,US);
H04W8/18 (EP,CN,US);
H04W8/20 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,CN,US);
H04L41/0876 (US);
H04L41/5025 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/564 (EP,CN,US);
H04M2215/0188 (EP,CN,US);
H04W8/02 (EP,CN,US);
H04W84/04 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (US);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/32] | H04W4/00, G06F15/16 | ||
Former IPC [2011/49] | G06F9/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIRTUELLE DIENSTANBIETERSYSTEME | [2011/49] | English: | VIRTUAL SERVICE PROVIDER SYSTEMS | [2011/49] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE FOURNITURE DE SERVICES VIRTUELS | [2011/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 31.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.09.2015 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 13.10.2015 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2010 | AT | 23.12.2015 | BE | 23.12.2015 | BG | 23.12.2015 | CY | 23.12.2015 | CZ | 23.12.2015 | DK | 23.12.2015 | EE | 23.12.2015 | ES | 23.12.2015 | FI | 23.12.2015 | HR | 23.12.2015 | IT | 23.12.2015 | LT | 23.12.2015 | LV | 23.12.2015 | MC | 23.12.2015 | MK | 23.12.2015 | NL | 23.12.2015 | PL | 23.12.2015 | RO | 23.12.2015 | SE | 23.12.2015 | SI | 23.12.2015 | SK | 23.12.2015 | SM | 23.12.2015 | TR | 23.12.2015 | IE | 19.01.2016 | LU | 19.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | NO | 23.03.2016 | GR | 24.03.2016 | IS | 23.04.2016 | PT | 26.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.01.2010 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.01.2010 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
MT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
TR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.01.2010 | |
AT | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CY | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MK | 23.12.2015 | ||
MT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
MT | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SI | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
BE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
DK | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
MC | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
SM | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
IS | 23.04.2016 | ||
PT | 26.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 23.12.2015 | |
CZ | 23.12.2015 | ||
EE | 23.12.2015 | ||
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
IT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
PL | 23.12.2015 | ||
RO | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
SK | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
ES | 23.12.2015 | ||
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 23.12.2015 | |
FI | 23.12.2015 | ||
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
NL | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
LV | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 23.12.2015 | |
HR | 23.12.2015 | ||
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 23.12.2015 | |
LT | 23.12.2015 | ||
SE | 23.12.2015 | ||
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 23.12.2015 | |
NO | 23.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 23.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002164983 (RAVIV LI-ON [IL], et al) [X] 1-42 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0305] * * figures 1-6 *; | [I]US2003233332 (KEELER JAMES D [US], et al) [I] 1-42 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0180] ** figures 1-13 *; | [I]US2004102182 (REITH LOTHAR [DE], et al) [I] 1-42 * abstract * * page 1 - page 47 * * figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2006135144 (JOTHIPRAGASAM PREMKUMAR [US]) [X] 1-42 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 1-7 *; | [I]US2007280453 (KELLEY SEAN S [US], et al) [I] 1-42 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 1-5 * | International search | [Y]US2003224781 (MILFORD MATTHEW A [US], et al); | [Y]US2005060266 (DEMELLO MARCO A [US], et al); | [Y]US2006206904 (WATKINS DOUGLAS A [US], et al) |