Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2430036

EP2430036 - SUBSTITUTED 6-(BENZYLAMINO) PURINE RIBOSIDE DERIVATIVES, USE THEREOF AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THESE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.06.2015
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, SM, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého v Olomouci
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
Biopatterns s.r.o.
Slechtitelu 813/21
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
[2012/12]
Inventor(s)01 / SZUCOVA, Lucie
Handkeho 757/1A
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
02 / KRYSTOF, Vladimir
Varsavske nam. 7
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
03 / ZATLOUKAL, Marek
Revolucni 18a
787 01 Sumperk / CZ
04 / DOLEZAL, Karel
Posluchov 31
783 65 Hlubocky / CZ
05 / STRNAD, Miroslav
Zapadni 25
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
06 / SPICHAL, Lukas
Tr. Svornosti 14
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
 [2012/12]
Representative(s)Gabrielova, Marta
Inventia s.r.o. Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2012/12]
Application number, filing date10736593.412.05.2010
WO2010CZ00061
Priority number, dateCZ20090000298U14.05.2009         Original published format: CZ 200900298 U
[2012/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010130233
Date:18.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2430036
Date:21.03.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2010
[2012/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2430036
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search reportEP18.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:C07H19/167, A61K31/7076
[2012/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE 6-(BENZYLAMINO)PURINRIBOSIDDERIVATE, DEREN VERWENDUNG UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE DIESE DERIVATE ENTHALTEN[2012/12]
English:SUBSTITUTED 6-(BENZYLAMINO) PURINE RIBOSIDE DERIVATIVES, USE THEREOF AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THESE DERIVATIVES[2012/12]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE RIBOSIDE DE 6-BENZYLAMINOPURINE SUBSTITUÉE, LEURS UTILISATIONS ET COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT CES DÉRIVÉS[2012/12]
Entry into regional phase22.11.2011National basic fee paid 
22.11.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/12]
27.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
18.06.2014Fee for grant paid
18.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.03.2014
Opposition(s)04.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.05.2010
AT30.07.2014
BE30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
SM30.07.2014
TR30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
[2017/38]
Former [2017/03]AT30.07.2014
BE30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2016/32]AT30.07.2014
BE30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2016/06]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/50]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SK30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
PL30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT30.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9323418  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [X] 1-3,9 * page 29; example 21 *;
 [X]DE2055160  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH) [X] 1-4,6,9 * compound 1 *;
 [X]WO2006125190  (CV THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0137] , [0141] *;
 [X]US2006166248  (FISCHER BILHA [IL], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0098]; compound 13a *;
 [X]DE2524284  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH) [X] 1-4,6,9 * example 1 *;
 [X]DE1670265  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH) [X] 1-4,6,9 * examples 4,6,21,24 *;
 [X]DE1670175  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH) [X] 1-4,6,9 * examples 4,14 *;
 [X]WO2004058791  (USTAV EX BOTAN AKADEMIE VED CE [CZ], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [X]  - COSYN LIESBET ET AL, "2-Triazole-Substituted Adenosines: A New Class of Selective A3 Adenosine Receptor Agonists, Partial Agonists, and Antagonists", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/JM0608208, vol. 49, no. 25, ISSN 0022-2623, (20061214), pages 7373 - 7383, (20061115), XP009132900 [X] 1-3,9 * table 1; compound 33 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0608208
 [X]  - BRESSI J C ET AL, "ADENOSINE ANALOGUES AS INHIBITORS OF TRYPANOSOMA BRUCEI PHOSPHOGLYCERATE KINASE: ELUCIDATION OF A NOVEL BINDING MODE FOR A 2-AMINO-N6-SUBSTITUTED ADENOSINE", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US LNKD- DOI:10.1021/JM000287A, (20000101), vol. 43, no. 22, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4135 - 4150, XP000999137 [X] 1-3,9 * table 1; compounds 29b-36b *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm000287a
by applicant   - MILLER ET AL., J AM. CHEM. SOC., (1955), vol. 77, pages 1392 - 1392,
    - LETHAM D.S., LIFE SCI., (1963), vol. 8, pages 569 - 573,
    - MLEJNEK; KUGLIK, J CELL. BIOCHEM., (2000), vol. 77, pages 6 - 17,
    - RATHBONE ET AL., MED HYPOTHESES, (1992), vol. 37, pages 232 - 240,
    - FRANCESCHI ET AL., DRUG DEV. RES., (1996), vol. 39, pages 442 - 449,
    - COTTAM ET AL., J MED CHEM., (1993), vol. 36, pages 3424 - 3430,
    - KOHNO ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1996), vol. 221, pages 849 - 849,
    - ISHII ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA-MOL. CELL RES., (2003), vol. 1643, pages 11 - 24,
    - ISHII ET AL., CELL GROWTH & DIFFERENTIATION, (2002), vol. 13, pages 19 - 26,
    - MLEJNEK; PROCHAZKA, PLANTA, (2002), vol. 215, pages 158 - 166,
    - MLEJNEK ET AL., PLANT SCI., (2005), vol. 168, pages 389 - 395,
    - SROKA ET AL., MOL PHARMACOL., (2010), vol. 77, no. 2, pages 255 - 61,
    - PONGRACZ J; LORD JM, BIOCHEM.BIOPHYS.RES.COMMUN., (1998), vol. 247, pages 624 - 629,
    - PONGRACZ J ET AL., JBIOL.CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 37329 - 37334,