EP2488359 - METHOD FOR MAKING BRIQUETTES FROM COMMINUTED STRAW AND A DEVICE TO PRODUCE BRIQUETTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Junczyk, Adam Piotr Ul. Sitnicka 19/3 21-500 Biala Podlaska / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states Junczyk, Adam Piotr Ul. Sitnicka 19/3 21-500 Bia a Podlaska / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/34] | Representative(s) | Belz, Anna, et al ul. Pólnocna 6/24 20-064 Lublin / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Belz, Anna, et al Polnocna 6/24 20-064 Lublin / PL | ||
Former [2013/21] | Belz, Anna, et al Law & Patent Office Anna Belz Ul. Biernackiego 12/18 20-089 Lublin / PL | ||
Former [2012/34] | Belz, Anna ul. Sekutowicza 19/2 20-152 Lublin / PL | Application number, filing date | 10737123.9 | 18.06.2010 | [2015/42] | WO2010PL00049 | Priority number, date | PL20090388314 | 18.06.2009 Original published format: PL 38831409 | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010147493 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2488359 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2488359 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B30B11/24, B30B15/30, B30B15/34, C10L5/44, C10L5/36, B29C47/38, B29C47/60 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
B30B11/246 (EP,US);
B29C48/911 (US);
B29C48/04 (EP,US);
B29C48/06 (EP,US);
B29C48/397 (EP,US);
B29C48/535 (EP,US);
B30B15/308 (EP,US);
B30B15/34 (EP,US);
C10L5/361 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/34] | B30B11/24, B30B15/30, B30B15/34, C10L5/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PRESSLINGEN AUS ZERKLEINERTEM STROH UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PRESSLINGEN | [2012/34] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING BRIQUETTES FROM COMMINUTED STRAW AND A DEVICE TO PRODUCE BRIQUETTES | [2012/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE BRIQUETTES À PARTIR DE PAILLE BROYÉE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE BRIQUETTES | [2012/34] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 25.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/34] | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.02.2015 | 24.02.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees SI, HU, TR, SM, SK, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 25.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.07.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 25.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.07.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 25.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 25.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.10.2015 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | ES | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | HR | 14.10.2015 | IT | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | MK | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SM | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | NO | 14.01.2016 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | IE | 18.06.2016 | LU | 18.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
LU | 18.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
IE | 18.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 14.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8705619 (GNII KVARTSEVOGO STEKLA [SE]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, lines 21-33 * * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 5 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2269131 (CLIFTON PETER LESLIE [GB]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]AT401525B (TESSMER GERO ING [AT]) [A] 1-3 * page 4, lines 21-50 * * page 5, lines 15-20 * * claims 1-2,4 *; | [A]WO0018572 (PURKERT METALL & FORM GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1-3 * pages 1-3,8-12; claims 1,10,14 *; | [A]EP1193045 (HAMILTON ROBIN [GB]) [A] 1-3 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 44 * * page 8, paragraph 73 * * claim 1 * * figure 7 *; | [A]DE10254373 (KAMPWERTH UMWELTTECHNIK GMBH & [DE]) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]CA2587025 (LUMB KEVIN D [CA]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2009006752 (ZEKAR JANEZ [CH], et al) [I] 1-3 * the whole document * | Examination | - Che Zhanbin, "Normal Temperature Briquetting Technology for Biomass with Original Moisture Content", International Conference on Bioenergy Utilization and Environment Protection 6th LAMNET Workshop - Dalian, China 2003, (20040907), pages 1 - 6, XP055054601 | - GROVER P D ET AL, BIOMASS BRIQUETTING: TECHNOLOGY AND PRACTICES Passage, BIOMASS BRIQUETTING: TECHNOLOGY AND PRACTICES, FOOD AND AGRICULTURAL ORGANIZATION OF THE UNITED NATIONS, PAGE(S) I-V, (19960401), XP003025658 | by applicant | PL198907 | GB2269131 | CA2587025 | WO2009006752 |