|
04.05.2021 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.04.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
13.04.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.04.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.03.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2021 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2021 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2020 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.2020 |
Communication about missing proof of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2020 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2020 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Communication about missing proof of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
09.07.2020 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
18.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Consolidated list of documents cited in appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
25.05.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2018 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 074 |
Appeal |
7 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 075 |
Appeal |
20 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 076 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 077 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
02.08.2017 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 013 |
Appeal |
63 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 014 |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 015 |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 016 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 017 |
Appeal |
490 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 018 |
Appeal |
71 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 019 |
Appeal |
15 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 020 |
Appeal |
14 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 021 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 022 |
Appeal |
47 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 023 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 024 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 025 |
Appeal |
125 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 026 |
Appeal |
13 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 027 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 028 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 029 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 030 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 031 |
Appeal |
18 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 032 |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 033 |
Appeal |
18 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 034 |
Appeal |
147 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 035 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 036 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 037 |
Appeal |
18 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 038 |
Appeal |
14 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 039 |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 040 |
Appeal |
12 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 041 |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 042 |
Appeal |
18 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 043 |
Appeal |
14 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 044 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 045 |
Appeal |
36 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 046 |
Appeal |
103 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 047 |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 048 |
Appeal |
87 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 049 |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 050 |
Appeal |
20 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 051 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 052 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 053 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 054 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 055 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 056 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 057 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 058 |
Appeal |
8 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 059 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 060 |
Appeal |
14 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 061 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 062 |
Appeal |
756 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 063 |
Appeal |
33 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 064 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 065 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 066 |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 067 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 068 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 069 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 070 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 071 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 072 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 073 |
Appeal |
124 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
17.05.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.12.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.03.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.10.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
20 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2015 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2015 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
05.12.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
219 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2014 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
220 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
227 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
221 |
|
04.04.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
04.04.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
09.03.2012 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
03.01.2012 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
222 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
242 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
16 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
223 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |