|
24.04.2023 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2023 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
31.03.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
31.03.2023 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
17.03.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.03.2023 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.03.2023 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.03.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
15 |
|
09.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.03.2023 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.03.2023 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2023 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.09.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.08.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
15 |
|
26.04.2022 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
15 |
|
18.03.2022 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2022 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.03.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.02.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2022 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 003 |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 004 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 005 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 006 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 007 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
21.12.2020 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 001 |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 002 |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 003 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 004 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 005 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 006 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 007 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 008 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 009 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 010 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 011 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 012 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 013 |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 014 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 015 |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Citation in appeal procedure - 016 |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
25.03.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
77 |
|
14.03.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2019 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2019 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2018 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2018 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.04.2018 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.03.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2017 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Decision on the taking of evidence |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Summons to give evidence |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Summons to give evidence |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
27.07.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.07.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.07.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2013 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.03.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.08.2012 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Request for further processing allowed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.07.2012 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.2012 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.03.2011 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
29.12.2010 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.12.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
20.08.2010 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
5 |