EP2531323 - PORTABLE WELD COOLING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fast Fusion, LLC Post Office Box 158 Palisade, CO 81526 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Fast Fusion LLC Post Office Box 158 Palisade, CO 81526 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKINLEY, Richard, S. Post Office Box 158 Palisade CO 81526 / US | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Moore, Michael Richard, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2020/18] |
Former [2012/50] | Moore, Michael Richard, et al Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 10763532.8 | 24.09.2010 | [2020/18] | WO2010US50159 | Priority number, date | US20100701527 | 06.02.2010 Original published format: US 701527 | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011096962 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2531323 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2531323 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2531323 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23K37/00, B23K37/02, B23K37/053 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
B23K37/003 (EP,US);
B23K37/0294 (EP,US);
B23K37/0533 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHE SCHWEISSKÜHLUNGSANLAGE | [2019/42] | English: | PORTABLE WELD COOLING SYSTEMS | [2012/50] | French: | SYSTÈME DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE SOUDURE TRANSPORTABLE | [2019/42] |
Former [2012/50] | TRAGBARE SCHWEISSKÜHLUNGSSYSTEME | ||
Former [2012/50] | SYSTÈMES PORTATIFS DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE SOUDURE | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 15.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 23.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 07.07.2020 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | EP20165044.7 / EP3693128 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2010 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | IE | 24.09.2020 | LU | 24.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | FR | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 24.09.2020 | ||
LU | 24.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.09.2010 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 24.09.2020 | ||
LU | 24.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 24.09.2020 | ||
LU | 24.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 24.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 24.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2002239778 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-19 * abstract *; | [Y]US7241973 (DI NOVO IGNATIUS L [US], et al) [Y] 1-19* figure 1 * | Examination | JPS58141852 |