|
08.05.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.2020 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.2020 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.02.2020 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
16.01.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Opposition |
15 |
|
16.01.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2019 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.11.2019 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.04.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.01.2019 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.01.2019 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
24.01.2019 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2018 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.12.2017 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.08.2017 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2017 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.08.2017 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.2017 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2017 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2017 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.03.2017 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2016 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2016 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2015 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
52 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
40 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
52 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
19.08.2015 |
Translation of the evidence during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
21.11.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2013 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2012 |
Published international application - A9 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.03.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.12.2010 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
18.10.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |