EP2425279 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING WETTABILITY OF AN OIL RESERVOIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
PT
SE
SM
PRAD Research and Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | For:BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
PT
SE
SM
PRAD Research and Development Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | |||
For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | |||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited PO Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Roadtown, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREEDMAN, Robert 5702 Grape Street Houston TX 77096 / US | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Bailey, Richard Alan Marks & Clerk LLP 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10770258.1 | 28.04.2010 | WO2010US32754 | Priority number, date | US20090431847 | 29.04.2009 Original published format: US 431847 | [2012/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010126998 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2425279 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/32, E21B47/00, G01V3/38, G01V3/18, G01N24/08 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
G01N24/081 (EP,US);
G01V3/32 (EP,US);
G01R33/448 (EP,US);
Y02A90/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/10] | G01V3/32, E21B47/00, G01V3/38, G01V3/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER BEFEUCHTBARKEIT EINES ÖLRESERVOIRS | [2012/10] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING WETTABILITY OF AN OIL RESERVOIR | [2012/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER LA MOUILLABILITÉ D'UN RÉSERVOIR D'HUILE | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 23.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6765380 (FREEDMAN ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - line 18 * * column 2, line 35 - line 55 * * column 4, line 29 - column 6, line 67 * * column 13, line 58 - column 14, line 4 *; | [Y]US5162733 (BALDWIN BERNARD A [US]) [Y] 1-19 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 16 * * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 8 *; | [A]US3657730 (ROBINSON JOSEPH D, et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 3, line 24 - line 67 *; | [A]US2005221495 (BELL STEPHEN A [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] - [0014] - [0034] - [0036] *; | [A]US6346813 (KLEINBERG ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 8 - line 13 * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 4 * | International search | [A]US5162733 (BALDWIN BERNARD A [US]); | [A]US5578922 (LURIE DAVID J [GB], et al); | [A]US6765380 (FREEDMAN ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US7397240 (FLEURY MARC [FR], et al) |