EP2559012 - SYSTEM FOR SECURE PAYMENT OVER A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iZettle Merchant Services AB Kungsgatan 9 111 43 Stockholm / SE | [2014/25] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states iZettle Merchant Services AB Östermalmsgatan 33 100 40 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUND, Stefan Tiokampsvägen 7 SE-517 35 Bollebygd / SE | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2013/08] | Östlund, Johanna Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 4289 203 14 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 10776094.4 | 26.10.2010 | WO2010EP66186 | Priority number, date | US20100362912P | 09.07.2010 Original published format: US 362912 P | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012003892 | Date: | 12.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2559012 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2559012 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G06Q20/00 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
G06Q20/326 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3226 (US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3229 (US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3823 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3825 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3829 (US);
G06Q20/409 (US);
G07F7/0886 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G07F7/1033 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR SICHEREN ZAHLUNGSVORGANG ÜBER EIN DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ | [2013/08] | English: | SYSTEM FOR SECURE PAYMENT OVER A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2013/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PAIEMENT SÉCURISÉ SUR UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 26.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.02.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14166368.2 / EP2763109 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 18.06.2014 | AT | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | HR | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | MK | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | RS | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | SM | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MK | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RS | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1213691 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] - [0031] *; | [I]US2004058705 (MORGAN RUSSELL [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0057] - [0075] - [0103] - [0112] *; | [I]US2004104268 (BAILEY KENNETH STEPHEN [US]) [I] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1553518 (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0048] - [0062] , [0063] *; | [A]US7003316 (ELIAS GEORGES F [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 55 * * column 6, line 56 - column 13, line 40 *; | [I]US2006049255 (VON MUELLER CLAY [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0064] - [0072] - [0087] - [0089] *; | [A]EP1710758 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] - [0029] *; | [A]US2008179401 (HART ANNMARIE D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0047] *; | [A]US2008189214 (MUELLER CLAY VON [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** paragraphs [0067] , [0090] - [0108] - [0117] - [0138] - [0204] - [0217] - [0244] - [0264] * | Examination | US2006064391 | - KUROKAWA MAKOTO ET AL, "Business Innovation / Products and Technologies Development of EMV Level2 Middleware Implementing IC Credit System", (20060301), URL: http://www.nec.com/en/global/techrep/journal/g06/n01/pdf/t060114.pdf, (20131017), XP055084361 |