EP2436516 - CHROMATE-FREE BLACK COATED METAL PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.11.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/27] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | ||
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORISHITA, Atsushi c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Kimitaka c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 03 /
FUDA, Masahiro c/o NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10780680.4 | 26.05.2010 | WO2010JP59291 | Priority number, date | JP20090127562 | 27.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009127562 | [2012/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010137726 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2436516 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2436516 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/09, B05D7/14, B05D7/24, C09D5/08, C09D7/12, C09D133/00, C09D167/00, C09D175/04, C09D175/06 | [2012/14] | CPC: |
C09D175/04 (EP,US);
B32B15/09 (KR);
B05D7/14 (EP,KR,US);
B05D7/24 (KR);
C09D167/00 (EP,US);
C09D5/08 (EP,KR,US);
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
C09D7/65 (EP,US);
C09D7/67 (EP,US);
C09D7/68 (EP,US);
C09D7/69 (EP,US);
B05D2601/02 (EP,US);
B05D3/108 (EP,US);
B05D5/06 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08L2205/18 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L61/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D167/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METALLPLATTE MIT CHROMATFREIER SCHWARZER BESCHICHTUNG | [2014/10] | English: | CHROMATE-FREE BLACK COATED METAL PLATE | [2012/14] | French: | PLAQUE MÉTALLIQUE AVEC REVÊTEMENT NOIR EXEMPT DE CHROMATE | [2014/10] |
Former [2012/14] | CHROMATFREIE SCHWARZ BESCHICHTETE METALLPLATTE | ||
Former [2012/14] | PLAQUE MÉTALLIQUE REVÊTUE DE NOIR SANS CHROMATE | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2011 | Translation filed | 21.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 29.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.12.2014
ADMISSIBLE ArcelorMittal France Immeuble "Le Cézanne" 6, rue André Campra 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | [2015/04] | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 19.01.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.05.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.03.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 06.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.11.2020 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/52] | Appeal following opposition | 17.05.2017 | Appeal received No. T1182/17 | 24.07.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.10.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: REVOCATION OF PATENT AT PROPRIETOR'S REQUEST | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.03.2014 | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | HR | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | MK | 12.03.2014 | MT | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SM | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | IE | 26.05.2014 | LU | 26.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | GB | 12.06.2014 | NO | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MK | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 26.05.2014 | ||
LU | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 26.05.2014 | ||
LU | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 26.05.2014 | ||
LU | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SM | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 26.05.2014 | ||
LU | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
MT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 26.05.2014 | ||
LU | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 26.05.2014 | ||
LU | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 26.05.2014 | ||
LU | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GB | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
IE | 26.05.2014 | ||
LU | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 26.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
LU | 26.05.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
HR | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
NO | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | |
NO | 12.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62185227 ; | [A]US5349010 (KUO THAUMING [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5556935 (TRAEUBEL HARRO DIPL CHEM DR [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * examples 2,3 *; | [A]EP1607424 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE LLC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008078956 (POSCO [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0067] - [0132]; examples 1-17; tables 1,2 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 38, Database accession no. 1987-267142, XP002684222 & JPS62185227 A 19870813 (MATSUSHITA ELEC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0539458 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [Y]JP2001106970 (TOYO BOSEKI); | [Y]JP2006264083 (JFE STEEL KK); | [Y]JP2006346934 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [Y]JP2007204847 (NIHON PARKERIZING); | [Y]WO2008105247 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2009034973 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND) |