EP2441387 - SLEEPINESS ASSESSMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagoya City University 1, Aza Kawasumi Mizuho-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8601 / JP | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOYAMA, Kiyoko c/o Graduate School of Design and Architecture Nagoya City University 1-10 Kita Chikusa 2-chome Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-0083 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Issei c/o Graduate School of Design and Architecture Nagoya City University 1-10 Kita Chikusa 2-chome Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-0083 / JP | 03 /
OHASHI, Hayato c/o Graduate School of Design and Architecture Nagoya City University 1-10 Kita Chikusa 2-chome Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-0083 / JP | 04 /
TABATA, Genki c/o Graduate School of Design and Architecture Nagoya City University 1-10 Kita Chikusa 2-chome Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-0083 / JP | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10786066.0 | 26.05.2010 | WO2010JP58904 | Priority number, date | JP20090137551 | 08.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009137551 | [2012/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010143535 | Date: | 16.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2441387 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/16, A61B5/0245, A61B5/18, A61B5/11 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/18 (EP,US);
A61B5/02405 (US);
A61B5/0245 (EP,US);
A61B5/0816 (EP,US);
A61B5/6887 (EP,US);
B60K28/02 (EP);
B60K28/066 (EP);
B60W2040/0827 (EP,US);
B60W2540/22 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/902 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHLÄFRIGKEITSBEURTEILUNG | [2012/16] | English: | SLEEPINESS ASSESSMENT DEVICE | [2012/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉVALUATION DE LA SOMNOLENCE | [2012/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2011 | Translation filed | 08.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 25.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2015 | Observations by third parties | 14.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.09.2018 | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/46] | 08.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 06.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9533403 (BADER GABY [SE]) [X] 1-5 * page 4, lines 17-20 ** page 5, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph 2 *; | [X]US2004215265 (KEIZER DIEDERICK M [NL]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0039] - [0040] *; | [X]US2007123758 (MIESEL KEITH A [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0015] , [0050] , [0119] * | International search | [Y]JP2004344269 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [Y] - HAJIME TAKADA, "Seiri Joho o Mochiita Untenchu no Kakuseido Hyoka System ni Kansuru Kenkyu", Preprints of Meeting on Automotive Engineers, (20060524), pages 21 - 26, XP008164875 | [Y] - BUNJI ATSUMI, "Shinpaku Keisoku ni yoru Driver no Ishiki Jotai Hyoka", Preprints of Meeting on Automotive Engineers, (19940901), vol. 946, pages 133 - 136, XP008164885 | [Y] - MITSUO YASUSHI, "Estimating Sleepiness during Expressway Driving", JOURNAL OF INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF LIFE INFORMATION SCIENCE, (20030901), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 445 - 448, XP008165421 | Examination | JPH08182667 | JPH11314534 | US6506153 | JP2005342188 | US2006004266 | US2006155175 | WO2008069337 | JP2008161664 | US2010049066 | - Etsunori Fujita ET AL, "Development of the measurement method of the prediction of sleep by finger plethysmogram data", The Japanese Journal of Ergonomics, (20050101), pages 203 - 212, URL: https://www.jstage.jst.go.jp/article/jje1965/41/4/41_4_203/_pdf, (20160404), XP055262449 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5100/jje.41.203 | by applicant | JP2008161664 | JP2009137551 | other | JPH08182667 | JPH11314534 | JP2005342188 | US2006155175 | JP2006182667 | US2010049066 |