EP2441070 - ELECTRONIC PAPER DISPLAY WHITESPACE UTILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2014/10] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states SKIFF, LLC 300 W. 57th Street, 40th Floor New York, NY 10021 / US | ||
For all designated states eBooks Technologies, Inc. 7745 Herschel Avenue LaJolla, CA 92037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE CHEVALIER, Vincent 1180 Randol Avenue San Jose CA 94126 / US | 02 /
CONBOY, Garth 7778 Ludington Place La Jolla CA 92037 / US | 03 /
LESHNER, William 7855 Pipit Place San Diego CA 92129 / US | 04 /
RICHARDS, Ruze 13 Ashley Drive Holmdel NJ 07733 / US | 05 /
DUGA, Brady 3134 Del Rey Avenue Carlsbad CA 92009 / US | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2012/16] | Antila, Harri Jukka Tapani Kolster Oy Ab P.O. Box 148 (Iso Roobertinkatu 23) 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 10786625.3 | 07.06.2010 | WO2010US37600 | Priority number, date | US20090482013 | 10.06.2009 Original published format: US 482013 | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010144351 | Date: | 16.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2441070 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06F9/44 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/16] | G09G5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Title | German: | WEISSRAUM-AUSNUTZUNG IN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN PAPIERANZEIGE | [2012/16] | English: | ELECTRONIC PAPER DISPLAY WHITESPACE UTILIZATION | [2012/16] | French: | UTILISATION DES BLANCS D'AFFICHAGE SUR PAPIER ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2012/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 20.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/18] | 09.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2003128234 (BROWN MICHAEL WAYNE [US], et al); | [Y]US2008215967 (ABRAMS EDWARD [US], et al); | [A]US2004003097 (WILLIS BRIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2004215508 (REBENACK LARRY M [US], et al); | [A]US7379976 (HUAT KHOO SOON [US]) |