EP2442710 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OBTAINING AND PROCESSING BALLISTOCARDIOGRAPH DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heart Force Medical Inc. 305-1818 Cornwall Avenue Vancouver, BC V6J 1C7 / CA | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSSE, Edward 642 Eaglewood Court Qualicum Beach, British Columbia V9K 0A3 / CA | 02 /
JAHNS, Graeme 7365 Capistrano Drive Burnaby, British Columbia V5A 1P7 / CA | 03 /
BURNS, James, Alexander 990 East 13th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5T 2L6 / CA | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2012/17] | Application number, filing date | 10788550.1 | 17.06.2010 | WO2010CA00895 | Priority number, date | US20090218025P | 17.06.2009 Original published format: US 218025 P | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010145009 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2442710 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/02, A61B19/00, A61B5/11 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/1102 (EP,US);
A61B5/02028 (US);
A61B5/029 (US);
A61B5/7278 (US);
A61B5/7282 (US);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERHALTEN UND VERARBEITEN VON BALLISTOKARDIOGRAFISCHEN DATEN | [2012/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OBTAINING AND PROCESSING BALLISTOCARDIOGRAPH DATA | [2012/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR OBTENIR ET TRAITER DES DONNÉES DE BALISTOCARDIOGRAPHE | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 23.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/29] | 24.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CA2709172 (HEART FORCE MEDICAL INC [CA]); | [AP]WO2009073986 (HEART FORCE MEDICAL INC [CA], et al); | [AP]WO2009073987 (HEART FORCE MEDICAL INC [CA], et al); | [A]WO03100450 (ANAMI KIMITAKA [JP], et al) |